Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Roberto Pinto (until 2023-06-30) | 1978-08-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frieder Merz (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
1 | Mike Haberkorn (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
1 | Felix Lutz (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
23 | Jan Hilke (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Fynn Geigle (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-04-25 | ||||
Maximilian Beinert (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-12-16 | ||||
Moritz Strompf (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-05 | ||||
Fynn Geigle (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-04-25 | ||||
Noah Mehr (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-03 | ||||
2 | Marcel Menges (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-11 | |||
3 | Marko Andric (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-04 | |||
4 | Efekan Zeybek (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-26 | |||
5 | Nico Melder (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Max Juha Simonis (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Dervis Erkan (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-08-13 | ||||
Philipp Schmidt (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-10-18 | ||||
Muhammed Ali Kücük (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-08-01 | ||||
Matthew Collins (from 2022-01-30) (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
8 | Luca Baltzer (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-12-29 | |||
9 | Jonah Laboard (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-12-19 | |||
10 | Jannis Boziaris (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-10 | |||
11 | Liam Gainey (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
13 | Florian Mülbert (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
14 | Sandor Belvari (from 2021-07-21) (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
15 | Louis Safranek (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-09-14 | |||
16 | Max Hauswirth (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-09-10 | |||
17 | Philipp Zentler (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-08-09 | |||
17 | Finn Herbold (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
18 | Leon Schales (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
20 | Moritz Nemela (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
22 | Mike Manegold (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
24 | Nils Wannemacher (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Dogukaan Sengül (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-05-14 | ||||
Seung-Jae Lim (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-02-13 | ||||
Sven Dauner (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-06 | ||||
6 | Rilind Kabashi (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
19 | Fabian Wagner (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-27 | |||
26 | Vladimir Kim (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
28 | Elias Mehr (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-08-14 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-08-22 12:00 |
1 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-09-10 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-19 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-26 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-02 11:00 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-17 13:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-24 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-31 11:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-20 14:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-28 12:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-12-04 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-06 14:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-12 11:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-20 11:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-27 14:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2022-03-04 18:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-02 13:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-04-20 18:30 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-23 13:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-30 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |