Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Dobler (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Paul Kalbfleisch (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-15 | |||
22 | Berat Arslan (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-09-23 | |||
31 | Leart Havolli (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-05-02 | |||
33 | Jonas Ferl (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Yannick Mallet (until 2021-06-30) | 2004-02-26 | ||||
3 | Tom Leinhos (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-02 | |||
4 | Felix Urbon (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-18 | |||
5 | Jonah Schmincke (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-25 | |||
17 | Enes Bucan (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-21 | |||
19 | Niklas Heiderich (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-08 | |||
20 | Leon Lanatowitz (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-31 | |||
21 | Fabrizio di Giglio (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-05-30 | |||
25 | Sebastian Wöhr (from 2021-07-21) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-14 | |||
27 | Dumitru Farcas (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-11-29 | |||
27 | Finn Bindbeutel (from 2021-07-05) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-08-01 | |||
34 | Henry-Len Eckhardt (from 2021-09-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hazar Kanat (from 2022-01-30) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-07-18 | ||||
6 | Malte Suntrup (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-02 | |||
7 | Muhammed Bejdic (from 2022-01-30) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-13 | |||
8 | Dario Balta (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-10-10 | |||
8 | Robin Schmacke (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-26 | |||
10 | Tarkan Tahiri (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-30 | |||
11 | Luca Garcia (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-11-07 | |||
13 | Maximilian Agyekum (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-02 | |||
14 | Finn Mayer (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-24 | |||
15 | Erik Seidelmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-12-12 | |||
16 | Sasa Petrovic (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
17 | Jannes Paul Gremler (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-12 | |||
20 | Ilija Tilev (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-10 | |||
24 | Marlin Porada (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-08-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
13 | Titus Werner Trittel (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-08 | |||
29 | Marcel Felmeden (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-07 | |||
42 | Selcuk Yigitoglu (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2021-08-15 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-08-22 11:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-11 11:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-18 15:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-26 11:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-02 12:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-17 11:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-24 11:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-30 11:00 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-21 14:00 |
8 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-28 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-12-04 14:30 |
7 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-05 13:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-12 12:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-20 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-05 13:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-03-13 11:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-04-10 13:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-04-13 19:00 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-23 13:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-30 13:00 |
10 : 0 |
Schema Compare |