Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Kettemann (until 2024-06-30) | 1986-08-20 | ||||
Zlatan Bajramovic (until 2022-06-30) | 1979-08-12 | ||||
Julian Schwarz (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-02-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Thilo Marksteiner (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-06-16 | ||||
Jerik von der Felsen (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-10-22 | ||||
Max Weiß (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-06-15 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Aggelos Rafailidis (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-17 | ||||
Karlo Bungic (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-11 | ||||
Aron Unrath (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-08-10 | ||||
Louis Knapp (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-11 | ||||
Gianluca Giannetta (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-20 | ||||
Jonas Schleich (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-06-20 | ||||
Karim Elabed (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-27 | ||||
Said Souleymane (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-30 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Adrian Freiwald (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-18 | ||||
Bennet Fietkau (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-05-15 | ||||
Nico Theisinger (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-31 | ||||
Robert Geller (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-05 | ||||
Eren Öztürk (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-06-29 | ||||
Ramiz Kalici (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-08-09 | ||||
Egemen Sarikaya (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-08-23 | ||||
Michel Schwarz (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-09-04 | ||||
Jakob Weißer (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-04 | ||||
Alessandro Paunescu (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-05 | ||||
Firat Alpsoy (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-07-12 | ||||
Efe Kaan Sihlaroglu (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-07-08 | ||||
Jimmy Atila (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Tim Rossmann (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-11-11 | ||||
Shokhjakhon Khayrilloev (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-23 | ||||
Julian Gerold (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-07 | ||||
Dean Kanalas (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-06-21 | ||||
Stefano Marino (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-12 | ||||
Emre Ekiz (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-08 | ||||
Ali Dönmez (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-14 | ||||
Tyler Freeman (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2021-08-15 12:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-08-22 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-09-10 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-18 11:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-02 12:30 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-10-15 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-23 12:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-30 14:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-13 15:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-20 13:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-11-26 16:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-12-05 13:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-05 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-12 13:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-19 12:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2022-02-25 18:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-05 13:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-02 12:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-04-10 13:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-23 13:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-30 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |