Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Marc Kienle (from 2021-10-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1972-10-22 | ||||
Marcel Rapp (until 2021-10-02) | 1979-04-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Nahuel Noll (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-17 | ||||
Lukas Petersson (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-09 | ||||
Paul Siegers (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-09-04 | ||||
Tim Böff (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-07 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Florian Bähr (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-18 | ||||
Tim Ottilinger (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-05 | ||||
Leon Gebauer (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-05-28 | ||||
Tim Drexler (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-06 | ||||
Thomas Bauer (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-30 | ||||
Linus Weik (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-11-22 | ||||
Noah König (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-05-17 | ||||
Aleksei Carnier (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-10-30 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Sekou Doucoure-Tandiang (from 2022-01-28) (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-10-15 | ||||
Valentin Lassig (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-03 | ||||
Luka Duric (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-06-18 | ||||
Leart Haskaj (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-24 | ||||
Leon Leuze (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-12 | ||||
Lucas Tamarez (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-09-11 | ||||
Denis Perrone (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-10-19 | ||||
Amid Khan Agha (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-06 | ||||
Jaden Meyer (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-07-13 | ||||
Tom Bischof (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-28 | ||||
Mathieu Kambala (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-05-21 | ||||
Philip Akem (from 2021-10-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Felix Hagmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-29 | ||||
Turan Calhanoglu (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-09-26 | ||||
Nick Breitenbucher (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-14 | ||||
Rolands Bocs (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-06 | ||||
Umut Tohumcu (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-08-11 | ||||
Bambase Conte (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-07 | ||||
Cem Demir (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-10-03 | ||||
Uche Destiny Obiogumu (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-27 | ||||
Jakob Knollmüller (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-26 | ||||
Abdoul Camara (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-21 | ||||
Fisnik Asllani (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-08-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-08-14 13:00 |
6 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-08-21 13:00 |
3 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-11 12:00 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-18 14:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-25 12:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-16 13:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-24 11:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-31 11:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-20 12:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-27 12:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-01-29 14:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-06 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-12 12:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-19 13:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-26 13:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-05 12:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-12 13:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-02 12:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-04-20 18:30 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-23 13:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-30 11:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |