Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sinisa Suker (until 2022-06-30) | 1974-03-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Benjamin Skalnik (until 2022-06-30) | 1984-08-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Tobias Muller (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-08-28 | ||||
1 | Niclas Kratzmann (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-01 | |||
22 | Kaylen Reitmaier (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Eunseok Ko (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-10-13 | ||||
2 | Darko Ilic (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-01 | |||
5 | Simon Ludwig (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-22 | |||
17 | Brian Prempeh (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Moritz Krenc (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Daniel Bunk (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-25 | ||||
3 | Ken Tchouangue (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-09-06 | |||
4 | Jubes Mba Tibah Ticha (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-20 | |||
6 | Luca Thissen (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-04 | |||
14 | Jaden Meyer (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-07-13 | |||
15 | Fabian Sari (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-19 | |||
16 | Enes Yilmaz (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-25 | |||
16 | David Savic (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-08 | |||
18 | Stephan Soghomonian (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-12-03 | |||
19 | Luis Mankartz (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-21 | |||
19 | Daniel Bunk (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-25 | |||
20 | Nico Garic (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-29 | |||
21 | Eray Isik (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-10-25 | |||
24 | Kiyan Sadeghi (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-22 | |||
25 | Till Weingarten (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-13 | |||
26 | Luis Giesen (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ole Austrup (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-11-07 | ||||
3 | Benedict Diana (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-30 | |||
7 | Lennart Wagemann (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-24 | |||
8 | Nils Arne Gatzke (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-10-31 | |||
9 | Emir Kuhinja (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-04-19 | |||
9 | Ephraim Kalonji (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-28 | |||
11 | Marc Rommel (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-11 | |||
13 | Marco Daniel Stüttgen (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-06-11 | |||
17 | Justin Seven (from 2022-01-25) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-08-18 | |||
17 | Sebastian Papalia (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-02-17 | |||
23 | Birol Adibelli (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-05 | |||
25 | Paul Scalet (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-25 | |||
26 | Aldin Drndar (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-01-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2021-09-12 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-19 11:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-26 11:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-02 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-17 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-23 14:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-30 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-28 11:00 |
9 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-01-30 11:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-06 11:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-20 13:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-03-06 12:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-12 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-04-03 11:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-04-10 13:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-23 13:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-30 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |