Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alexander Ende (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1979-09-19 | ||||
Sebastian Konig (until 2022-12-31) | 1987-10-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Florian Dimmer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-15 | |||
1 | Linus Wirth (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-27 | |||
30 | Tiago Pereira Cardoso (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Yannik Dasbach (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-21 | ||||
2 | Simon Walde (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-04 | |||
3 | Joshua Uwakhonye (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-08-16 | |||
4 | Dimitrie Deumi-Nappi (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-16 | |||
5 | Ibrahim Digberekou (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Aaron Addo (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-12 | ||||
Nils Brühl (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-10 | ||||
Mohamed Ghait (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-30 | ||||
Philipp Groß (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-06 | ||||
Adonis Milaj (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-07 | ||||
Aaron Schreck (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-08 | ||||
Vincent Zajaczkowski (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-25 | ||||
Divine Berko (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-25 | ||||
6 | Tony Reitz (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-05 | |||
7 | Malcom Scheibner (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-10-09 | |||
8 | Moustafa Moustafa (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-15 | |||
9 | Winsley Boteli (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-05 | |||
10 | Shaban Zenku (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-04 | |||
11 | Lukas Korytowski (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-02 | |||
13 | Stefan Bloch (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-29 | |||
15 | Daniel Hülsenbusch (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-18 | |||
17 | Micael Nack (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-02 | |||
18 | Leo Ronan Arndt (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-31 | |||
19 | Selim Turping (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-12 | |||
20 | David Arize (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-02 | |||
22 | Konstantin Gerhardt (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-16 | |||
23 | Noah Adedeji (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-19 | |||
25 | Yvandro Sanches (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Luis Werrmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-10-07 | |||
14 | Michael Nduka (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-19 | |||
24 | Shio Fukuda (from 2023-01-15) (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-08-13 11:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-08-20 12:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2022-08-26 19:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-09-03 13:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-10-02 11:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-08 11:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-29 11:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-11-06 11:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-12 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-19 13:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-12-04 11:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-02-19 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-02-26 11:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-04 11:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-11 13:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |