Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Engin Vural (until 2023-12-30) | 1985-04-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Leon Schübel (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-05 | ||||
Feldspieler | |||||
Laurenz Jennissen (from 2023-06-01) (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Batuhan Yavuz (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-04 | ||||
Stevan Tasic (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-09-29 | ||||
Hamza Anhari (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-30 | ||||
Jaden Bagh (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-09-01 | ||||
Dorian Binaj (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-23 | ||||
Luka Blazevic (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-05 | ||||
Anes Dziho (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-03 | ||||
Dominic Grehl (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-11 | ||||
Lennart Heck (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-24 | ||||
Disimua Kanzi (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-13 | ||||
Noah Kashama (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-20 | ||||
Fabrice Kempe (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-04 | ||||
Lennox Kern (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-12 | ||||
Shawn Kiyau (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-19 | ||||
Berkem Eyyrb Kurt (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-14 | ||||
Jeremiaha Maluze (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-11 | ||||
Sven Meyer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-11 | ||||
Baran Mogultay (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-18 | ||||
Johann Müller (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-30 | ||||
Arbnor Murati (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-07 | ||||
Gjastin Nrejaj (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-05 | ||||
David Wieczorek (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-28 | ||||
David Zogu (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-18 | ||||
Enoch Moussa (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-06 | ||||
Anes Dziho (until 2022-07-30) | 2004-05-03 | ||||
Hadi Haidoura (until 2022-07-30) | 2004-04-01 | ||||
Caspar Jander (until 2022-07-30) | 2003-03-23 | ||||
Arbnor Murati (until 2022-07-30) | 2004-04-07 | ||||
Luca Nikolai (until 2022-07-30) | 2003-03-02 | ||||
Max Schreiber (until 2022-07-30) | 2003-03-06 | ||||
Leif Sören Linnig (until 2022-07-30) | 2005-08-18 | ||||
Stevan Tasic (until 2022-07-30) | 2005-09-29 | ||||
8 | Julius Bugenhagen (from 2023-02-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-11 | |||
10 | Leif Sören Linnig (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-08-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-08-14 14:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-08-21 11:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-08-28 11:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-09-04 11:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-10-02 11:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-08 13:15 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-10-30 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-11-06 12:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-12 11:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-19 14:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-12-04 11:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-02-18 11:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-02-25 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-04 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-11 13:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |