Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dennis Schmitt (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-05-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Nico Willeke (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-15 | |||
12 | Marten Brink (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Maximilian Schettke (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Stefan Brand (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Jermain Gerdes (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-05-21 | ||||
Emirhan Delifer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-11 | ||||
Jaden-Romeo Garris (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-06 | ||||
Jeyhun Hajiyev (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-17 | ||||
Erik Kerner (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-17 | ||||
Hassan Mohamad (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-22 | ||||
2 | Tim Brinkjost (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-13 | |||
3 | Mehmet Kaya (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-17 | |||
4 | Luis Flörke (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-22 | |||
5 | Kevin Krumme (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-10 | |||
6 | Linus Horey (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-02 | |||
7 | Yusuf Öztürk (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
7 | Joel Zambrano (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-10 | |||
8 | Medin Kojic (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-12-09 | |||
9 | Emre Gündogdu (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
10 | Can Gürek (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
10 | Özgür Koz (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-10 | |||
11 | Joel Westheide (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-23 | |||
13 | David Stamm (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-13 | |||
15 | Noel Czapelka (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-24 | |||
17 | Zvonimir Plavcic (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-01 | |||
18 | Paul Kohlstaedt (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-31 | |||
19 | Georg Ermolaev (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-09-22 | |||
19 | Georg Ermolaev (until 2022-07-30) | 2005-09-22 | |||
21 | Levin Delli Liuni (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-19 | |||
22 | Felix Brinkmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-05 | |||
23 | Alessandro Marino (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-11-03 | |||
24 | Giovanni Pollio (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-22 | |||
25 | Marvin Schulz (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-11 | |||
26 | Noah Mrosek (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-18 | |||
30 | Jens Balzukat (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-08-14 14:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-08-21 13:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-08-27 13:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-09-03 13:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-10-02 11:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-08 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-10-30 13:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-11-06 13:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-12 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-19 13:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-12-04 11:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-02-19 15:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-02-26 13:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-04 13:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-11 13:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |