Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Philipp Schütz (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Patrick Black (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Leon Feher (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-09 | |||
12 | Ryan Valentine (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Elias Bellahsen (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-06 | ||||
Jaden de Bellis (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-24 | ||||
Bilal El Ouamari (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-05 | ||||
Nils Jäckel (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-12-11 | ||||
Dennis Nuha (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-14 | ||||
Mario Ramku (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-13 | ||||
Tim Schwarz (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-07 | ||||
San Diego Leon Siebel (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-24 | ||||
Ardi Ukaj (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-12-30 | ||||
Kevin Zorawik (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-06 | ||||
2 | Tan Mersinli (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-27 | |||
3 | Koray Temiz (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-06 | |||
4 | Sebastian Schröder (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-04 | |||
5 | Fabio Bachmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-27 | |||
6 | Beslind Fazlija (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-16 | |||
7 | Shadrak Dombe (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-17 | |||
8 | Calvin Mockschan (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-30 | |||
9 | Baha Arslanboga (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-09 | |||
10 | Jan Tkacik (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-03 | |||
11 | Mick Beinhauer (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-21 | |||
13 | Emre Dervis (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-01 | |||
16 | Mattia Majetic (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-20 | |||
17 | Azad Sari (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-30 | |||
18 | Precious Spittmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-26 | |||
19 | Maximilian Alexy (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-15 | |||
20 | Chris-Leon Kayser (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-29 | |||
24 | Venhar Ismailji (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-18 | |||
25 | Bojan Potnar (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-11-11 | |||
25 | Christos Liampos (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-20 | |||
26 | Dominik Lewandowski (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
24 | Lein Tairi (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-08-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-08-14 11:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-08-21 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-08-27 15:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-09-03 13:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-01 13:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-08 11:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-29 13:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-11-06 11:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-12 12:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-19 11:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-12-03 13:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-02-12 11:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-02-25 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-04 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-11 13:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |