Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Kukowitsch (from 1951-05-01) (until 1951-06-30) | |||||
Hans Hofer (from 1950-11-29) (until 1951-04-30) | 1911-03-20 | ||||
Fritz Krauss (until 1950-11-28) | |||||
Rolf Kukowitsch (until 1950-11-28) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Gunter Busch (until 1961-06-30) | 1930-02-15 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Georg Zenker (until 1956-12-31) | 1921-03-03 | ||||
Walter Rose (until 1954-06-30) | 1912-11-05 | ||||
Rolf Mucklich (from 1951-01-01) (until 1952-12-31) | 1927-01-08 | ||||
Werner Brembach (until 1952-06-30) | 1912-08-22 | ||||
Werner Eilitz (until 1951-12-22) | 1923-08-29 | ||||
Fritz Godicke (until 1951-06-30) | 1919-10-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerhard Polland (until 1959-12-31) | 1920-03-07 | ||||
Gunther Knott (until 1954-12-31) | 1930-12-19 | ||||
Horst Scherbaum (until 1952-10-05) | 1925-08-02 | ||||
Heinz Ponert (until 1952-06-30) | 1920-08-20 | ||||
Gerhard Auerbach (until 1952-06-30) | |||||
Rolf Sommer (until 1951-06-30) | 1920-07-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Heinz Frohlich (until 1952-12-31) | 1926-02-15 | ||||
Rudolf Krause (until 1952-12-31) | 1927-01-21 | ||||
Gerhard Helbig (until 1952-12-31) | 1925-04-13 | ||||
Rolf Grupe (until 1952-06-30) | 1920-02-26 | ||||
Rudolf Hecker (until 1952-06-30) | 1923-04-06 | ||||
Werner Klaus (until 1951-06-30) | 1928-12-18 | ||||
Werner Steuer (until 1951-06-30) | 1920-03-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1951-05-20 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |