Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Janos Gyarmati (from 1953-07-01) (until 1954-06-30) | 1910-02-08 | ||||
Paul Doring (until 1953-06-30) | 1911-03-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Heinz Klemm (until 1954-06-30) | 1926-10-31 | ||||
Horst Kiesewetter (until 1954-06-30) | 1924-12-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Herbert Schoen (until 1954-06-30) | 1929-05-18 | ||||
Manfred Michael (until 1954-06-30) | 1926-07-18 | ||||
Erhard Haufe (until 1954-06-30) | 1924-07-13 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Duffke (until 1954-06-30) | 1929-01-27 | ||||
Horst Beulig (until 1954-06-30) | 1922-02-09 | ||||
Werner Fischer (until 1954-06-30) | 1927-10-26 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Herbert Maschke (until 1954-06-30) | 1930-09-02 | ||||
Gunther Usemann (until 1954-06-30) | 1929-04-09 | ||||
Kurt Fischer (until 1954-06-30) | 1923-04-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gunter Schroter (until 1954-06-30) | 1927-05-03 | ||||
Johannes Matzen (until 1954-06-30) | 1925-02-13 | ||||
Gunther Bethnarek (until 1954-06-30) | 1930-06-30 | ||||
Gerhard Hansicke (until 1954-06-30) | 1927-05-30 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Holze (until 1954-06-30) | 1930-06-30 | ||||
Rudolf Mobius (until 1954-06-30) | 1921-03-18 | ||||
Karl Schroder (from 1953-07-01) (until 1954-06-30) | 1929-05-31 | ||||
Lutz Schlosser (from 1953-07-01) (until 1954-06-30) | |||||
Wolfgang Hanel (until 1953-07-05) | 1928-11-02 | ||||
Gunter Thorhauer (until 1953-03-31) | 1931-11-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1953-07-05 00:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |