Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Karl Dittes (until 1955-12-31) | 1917-08-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Kurt Steinbach (until 1958-12-31) | 1932-08-03 | ||||
Rudolf Schmalfuss (until 1954-06-30) | 1924-12-25 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Johannes Loffler (until 1955-06-30) | 1924-10-22 | ||||
Siegfried Naeke (until 1955-06-30) | 1925-11-09 | ||||
Helmut Geuthner (until 1954-06-30) | 1920-12-19 | ||||
Heinz Reich (until 1953-06-30) | 1924-06-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Siegfried Wolf (until 1966-06-30) | 1926-01-05 | ||||
Karl Wolf (until 1960-12-31) | 1924-05-27 | ||||
Armin Gunther (until 1958-12-31) | 1924-04-24 | ||||
Hans Meyer (from 1953-07-01) (until 1958-12-31) | 1935-10-02 | ||||
Heinz Glaser (until 1957-12-31) | 1926-04-03 | ||||
Heinz Weissflog (until 1954-06-30) | 1921-03-21 | ||||
Paul Suss (until 1954-06-30) | 1921-06-20 | ||||
Heinz Kaden (until 1953-06-30) | 1920-08-22 | ||||
Harry Wendler (until 1953-06-30) | 1926-02-12 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Willy Troger (until 1962-06-30) | 1928-10-02 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Mohr (from 1953-07-01) (until 1960-12-31) | 1928-04-27 | ||||
Kurt Viertel (until 1960-12-31) | 1929-10-19 | ||||
Heinz Satrapa (from 1953-07-01) (until 1956-06-30) | 1927-07-07 | ||||
Friedhold Schuller (until 1955-06-30) | 1925-09-09 | ||||
Alfred Grafe (until 1954-06-30) | 1926-04-24 | ||||
Joachim Vogel (from 1953-07-01) (until 1953-11-30) | 1921-11-01 | ||||
Martin Fritzsch (until 1953-06-30) | 1921-05-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1953-07-05 00:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |