Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Janos Gyarmati (from 1955-01-10) (until 1956-04-29) | 1910-02-08 | ||||
Kurt Vorkauf (until 1955-01-09) | 1898-05-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Kurt Vorkauf (from 1955-01-10) (until 1962-03-01) | 1898-05-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Karl-Heinz Spickenagel (until 1964-06-30) | 1932-01-17 | ||||
Horst Jaschke (until 1962-06-30) | 1931-02-24 | ||||
Heinz Grunbeck (until 1955-06-30) | 1928-07-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans-Dieter Krampe (from 1955-07-01) (until 1969-06-30) | 1937-01-06 | ||||
Peter Kalinke (until 1968-06-30) | 1936-12-21 | ||||
Hans-Georg Kiupel (until 1966-06-30) | 1934-11-12 | ||||
Gerhard Marotzke (until 1960-12-31) | 1929-09-30 | ||||
Werner Eilitz (until 1958-12-31) | 1923-08-29 | ||||
Horst Wuhn (until 1955-12-31) | 1938-03-06 | ||||
Erhard Geissler (from 1955-07-01) (until 1955-12-31) | |||||
Johannes Rothlander (from 1955-07-01) (until 1955-12-31) | |||||
Gerhard Ebert (until 1955-06-30) | 1922-01-05 | ||||
Rolf Mucklich (until 1955-06-30) | 1927-01-08 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Werner Unger (from 1955-07-01) (until 1968-06-30) | 1931-05-04 | ||||
Hans Kuchler (from 1955-07-01) (until 1957-12-31) | 1933-10-14 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Giersch (until 1956-12-31) | 1933-02-13 | ||||
Manfred Huth (until 1955-12-31) | 1933-10-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Feldweg (until 1955-12-31) | 1934-09-07 | ||||
Werner Klose (until 1955-12-31) | 1924-07-10 | ||||
Horst Scherbaum (until 1955-06-30) | 1925-08-02 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Stenzel (until 1955-06-30) | 1931-11-08 | ||||
Heinz Klinkhammer (until 1955-06-30) | 1929-06-20 | ||||
Gunther Knott (until 1955-01-31) | 1930-12-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gunther Wirth (until 1965-06-30) | 1933-01-09 | ||||
Horst Kohle (until 1964-06-30) | 1935-10-07 | ||||
Gerhard Reichelt (until 1963-06-30) | 1931-02-15 | ||||
Lothar Meyer (until 1962-06-30) | 1933-08-01 | ||||
Heinz Kaulmann (until 1960-12-31) | 1934-09-28 | ||||
Siegfried Wachtel (until 1960-06-30) | 1932-04-28 | ||||
Horst Assmy (until 1959-09-30) | 1933-11-29 | ||||
Rolf Fritzsche (until 1959-09-30) | 1933-10-23 | ||||
Werner Wolf (until 1957-12-31) | 1925-02-22 | ||||
Roland Weigel (until 1955-12-31) | 1928-11-13 | ||||
Helmut Hartmann (until 1955-12-31) | |||||
Heinz Ryski (from 1955-07-01) (until 1955-12-31) | 1933-01-05 | ||||
Gerhard Vogt (until 1955-07-31) | 1933-11-30 | ||||
Werner Welzel (until 1955-06-30) | 1923-06-21 | ||||
Gerhard Handler (until 1955-06-30) | |||||
Rudolf Mitschke (until 1955-06-30) | |||||
Horst Schiller (until 1955-06-30) | 1926-12-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1955-08-26 00:00 |
3 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1955-08-31 00:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1955-09-11 15:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1955-09-25 15:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1955-10-02 15:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1955-10-09 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1955-10-16 14:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1955-10-30 14:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1955-11-06 14:00 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1955-11-30 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1955-12-04 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1955-12-11 14:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1955-12-18 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |