Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stephan Lerch (until 2021-06-30) | 1984-08-10 | ||||
Torhüterin | |||||
1 | Almuth Schult (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-02-09 | |||
12 | Julia Kassen (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-05-17 | |||
33 | Melina Loeck (from 2021-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-07-01 | |||
77 | Katarzyna Kiedrzynek (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-03-19 | |||
Torwart | |||||
12 | Jana Burmeister (until 2020-07-30) | 1989-03-06 | |||
27 | Friederike Abt (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-07-07 | |||
36 | Hedvig Lindahl (until 2020-07-30) | 1983-04-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Kathrin Hendrich (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-04-06 | |||
6 | Dominique Janssen (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-17 | |||
13 | Felicitas Rauch (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-04-30 | |||
16 | Noelle Maritz (until 2020-07-30) | 1995-12-23 | |||
19 | Sofie Svava (from 2021-01-01) (until 2022-01-13) | 2000-08-11 | |||
23 | Sara Doorsoun (until 2021-12-31) | 1991-11-17 | |||
24 | Joelle Wedemeyer | 1996-08-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Zsanett Jakabfi (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-02-18 | |||
5 | Lena Sophie Oberdorf (from 2020-07-05) (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-12-19 | |||
5 | Claudia Neto (until 2020-07-31) | 1987-11-30 | |||
9 | Anna Blasse (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-02-27 | |||
10 | Svenja Huth | 1991-01-25 | |||
14 | Fridolina Rolfo (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-11-24 | |||
15 | Ingrid Syrstad Engen (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-04-29 | |||
19 | Kristine Minde (until 2020-07-31) | 1992-08-08 | |||
21 | Lara Dickenmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-11-27 | |||
28 | Lena Goessling (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-03-08 | |||
30 | Lisanne Grawe (until 2021-06-30) | 2003-02-11 | |||
31 | Lotta Cordes (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-04-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Pauline Bremer (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-04-10 | |||
11 | Alexandra Popp | 1991-04-06 | |||
16 | Rebecka Blomqvist (from 2021-01-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-07-24 | |||
17 | Ewa Pajor (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-12-03 | |||
18 | Karina Saevik (from 2020-09-16) (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-03-24 | |||
22 | Shanice van de Sanden (from 2020-09-21) (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-10-02 | |||
22 | Pernille Harder (until 2020-08-31) | 1992-11-15 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Anna-Lena Stolze (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-07-08 | ||||
Melina Loeck (from 2020-07-09) (until 2020-12-31) | 2000-07-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2020-12-09 15:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2020-12-16 18:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-03-03 18:15 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-03-10 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-03-24 17:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-03-31 14:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |