Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willi Breuer (until 2019-12-31) | 1954-11-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Pauline Nelles (until 2020-06-30) | 2002-01-21 | |||
1 | Anne-Kathrine Kremer (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-12-30 | |||
18 | Saskia Frensch (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-02-23 | |||
19 | Claudia Hoffmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-08-06 | |||
22 | Marie Wenzl (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-12-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Hannah Scheffler (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-08-12 | |||
5 | Anna Kirschbaum (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-05-17 | |||
17 | Saskia Schreiner (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-10-03 | |||
21 | Peggy Nietgen (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-08-12 | |||
23 | Romina Frommont (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-03-30 | |||
27 | Kristina Hild (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-06-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michelle Biskup (until 2019-06-30) | 2002-01-24 | ||||
Esther Juretzka (from 2019-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 2002-09-24 | ||||
3 | Julia Pfannschmidt (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-06-08 | |||
4 | Leonie Prossl (until 2019-06-30) | 2002-06-16 | |||
6 | Kristina Bartsch (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-09 | |||
8 | Ann-Kathrin Vinken (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-02-17 | |||
9 | Hilda Djurberg (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-05-30 | |||
11 | Carolin Dej (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-01-05 | |||
12 | Alicia-Sophie Gudorf (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-05-23 | |||
14 | Vanessa Zilligen (until 2019-06-30) | 2001-05-07 | |||
14 | Laura Vogt (until 2019-06-30) | 2001-05-13 | |||
15 | Pia Knobloch (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-08-22 | |||
18 | Silvana Chojnowski (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-04-17 | |||
18 | Luisa Ballach (until 2019-06-30) | 2003-09-04 | |||
20 | Meike Messmer (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-10-28 | |||
24 | Theresa Gosch (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-09-17 | |||
26 | Marie Pyko (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-08-08 | |||
31 | Ileana Wünsche (until 2019-06-30) | ||||
31 | Julia Arnold (until 2019-01-11) | 1990-11-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
6 | Janet Stopka (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-07-25 | |||
7 | Carolin Schraa (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-09-06 | |||
9 | Chaima Khammar (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-09-14 | |||
9 | Yuka Hirano (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-01-27 | |||
10 | Amber Hearn (until 2019-06-30) | 1984-11-28 | |||
11 | Nina Windmuller (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-11-08 | |||
13 | Karoline Kohr (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-04-01 | |||
16 | Anne Hopfengartner (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-10-29 | |||
17 | Isabelle Linden (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-01-15 | |||
22 | Lara Hess (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-08-01 | |||
25 | Sonja Giraud (from 2019-01-18) (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-03-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2018-09-09 15:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |