Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Roger Muller (until 2019-06-30) | 1951-02-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Chareta Okken (until 2019-06-30) | ||||
12 | Emma Muhlenbrock (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-09-02 | |||
24 | Kathrin Klimas (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-12-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Kyra Speel (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-05-29 | ||||
2 | Thea Fullenkamp (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-01-10 | |||
4 | Celine Agema (until 2019-06-30) | ||||
5 | Pia Liening-Ewert (until 2018-12-31) | 1998-04-01 | |||
6 | Julia Bohlen (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-26 | |||
8 | Lisa-Marie Weiss (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-05 | |||
16 | Sarah Schulte (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-06-08 | |||
18 | Marieke de Boer (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-07-18 | |||
22 | Anna Maria Hegmann (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-11-07 | |||
23 | Ayleen Seyen (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-11-15 | |||
26 | Lynn Rahel Gismann (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-01-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Patrizia Janssen (until 2019-06-30) | 2001-03-02 | ||||
3 | Nina Rolfes (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-08-24 | |||
5 | Bianca Becker (from 2019-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-03-24 | |||
7 | Nele Schomaker (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-09-24 | |||
7 | Cagla Korkmaz (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-11-14 | |||
11 | Linda Preuss (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-30 | |||
14 | Elisa Senß (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-10-01 | |||
17 | Shiho Shimoyamada (until 2019-06-30) | ||||
19 | Pascalle Pomper (until 2019-06-30) | 2001-05-13 | |||
20 | Henrike Juraschek (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-08-18 | |||
21 | Nina Kossen (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-03-22 | |||
23 | Pia Flottemesch (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-02-11 | |||
25 | Amelie Kroger (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-03-17 | |||
27 | Sarah Jabbes (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-05-05 | |||
28 | Jasmin Jabbes (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-05-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Welislawa Dimitrowa (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-10-10 | |||
10 | Jalila Dalaf (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-03-07 | |||
13 | Maike Berentzen (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-02-10 | |||
15 | Finja Sasse (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-09-29 | |||
21 | Luisa Temmen (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-01-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2018-08-12 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2018-09-09 14:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |