Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainerin | |||||
Isabelle Stümper (until 2024-06-30) | 1986-08-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jana Theisen (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-08-02 | |||
25 | Kathrin Gunther (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-11-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
6 | Desiree Hennig (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-01-17 | |||
8 | Maren Weingarz (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-10-16 | |||
12 | Luisa Mais (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-07-13 | |||
12 | Natascha Rau (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-01-12 | |||
13 | Laura Weinel (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-10-28 | |||
14 | Carolin Dillenburg (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-07-13 | |||
15 | Eva Langenfeld (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-03-23 | |||
17 | Magdalena Schumacher (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-12-01 | |||
24 | Sarah Preussner (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-01-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Chiara Hahn (until 2020-06-30) | 2002-01-02 | |||
4 | Theresa Laux (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-05-16 | |||
5 | Sarah Meinerz (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-03-19 | |||
7 | Isabelle Stümper (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-08-14 | |||
10 | Laureen Ackermann (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-05-30 | |||
11 | Marie Schafer (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-02-01 | |||
11 | Elena Noll | 1994-11-18 | |||
18 | Magdalena Lang (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-08-11 | |||
18 | Lisa Umbach (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-06-09 | |||
20 | Sarah Krumscheid (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-09-23 | |||
21 | Caroline Asteroth (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-12-16 | |||
22 | Luisa Deckenbrock (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-11-22 | |||
31 | Antonia Hornberg (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-04-12 | |||
35 | Kathrin Schermuly (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-11-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Jana Sebastian (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-06-29 | ||||
5 | Loreana Liebetanz (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-09-14 | |||
9 | Celine Dickopf (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-05-07 | |||
9 | Anne Bauer (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-10-10 | |||
10 | Julia Schermuly (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-21 | |||
14 | Hannah Ackermann (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-05-06 | |||
16 | Karla Engels (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-08-30 | |||
19 | Jasmin Umlauf (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-06-07 | |||
28 | Alina Wagner (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-11-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2019-08-04 14:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2019-09-07 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |