Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jens Scheuer (until 2022-06-30) | 1978-10-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Laura Benkarth (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-10-14 | |||
28 | Jacintha Weimar (until 2020-08-31) | 1998-06-11 | |||
33 | Carina Schluter (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-11-08 | |||
Torhüterin | |||||
22 | Maria Luisa Grohs | 2001-06-13 | |||
44 | Cecilia Runarsdottir (from 2021-01-20) | 2003-07-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Laura Donhauser (from 2020-09-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-09-04 | |||
4 | Kristin Demann (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-04-07 | |||
5 | Hanna Glas (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-04-16 | |||
9 | Katharina Naschenweng (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-12-16 | |||
14 | Amanda Ilestedt (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-01-17 | |||
19 | Carina Wenninger (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-02-06 | |||
21 | Simone Laudehr (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-07-12 | |||
22 | Verena Faisst (until 2020-08-31) | 1989-05-22 | |||
24 | Julia Pollak (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-05-09 | |||
27 | Marina Hegering (from 2020-07-05) (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-04-17 | |||
30 | Carolin Simon (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-11-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Simone Boye Sorensen (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-03-03 | |||
6 | Lineth Beerensteyn (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-10-11 | |||
7 | Giulia Gwinn (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-07-02 | |||
8 | Melanie Leupolz (until 2020-08-26) | 1994-04-14 | |||
10 | Linda Dallmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-09-02 | |||
12 | Sydney Lohmann (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-06-19 | |||
13 | Cinzia Zehnder (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-08-04 | |||
16 | Lina Magull (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-08-15 | |||
17 | Klara Buhl (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-12-07 | |||
18 | Viviane Asseyi (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-11-20 | |||
23 | Karólína Vilhjálmsdóttir (from 2021-01-01) | 2001-08-08 | |||
25 | Sarah Zadrazil | 1993-02-19 | |||
36 | Anja Pfluger (until 2020-08-31) | 1993-11-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Gia Corley (from 2020-08-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-05-20 | |||
9 | Jovana Damnjanovic (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-11-24 | |||
11 | Lea Schuller (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-12 | |||
15 | Ivana Rudelic (from 2021-01-19) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-25 | |||
15 | Emily Gielnik (until 2020-08-31) | 1992-05-13 | |||
23 | Mandy Islacker (until 2020-08-31) | 1988-08-08 | |||
27 | Gia Corley (until 2020-07-31) | 2002-05-20 | |||
29 | Nicole Rolser (until 2020-08-31) | 1992-02-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2020-11-01 13:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-01-30 15:30 |
0 : 13 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-03-19 18:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-04-04 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |