Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Roman Riessler (until 2021-06-30) | 1980-12-22 | ||||
Torhüterin | |||||
Inga Buchholz (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-05-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Antonia Dimmig (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-03-29 | ||||
22 | Julia Haake (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-11-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dilara Agac (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-09-20 | ||||
Alexia Boldt (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-08-23 | ||||
Maren Huelsekopf (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-06-18 | ||||
Maria Kleinfeld (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-10-25 | ||||
Nadine König (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-09-03 | ||||
Jessica Purps (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-07-09 | ||||
Franziska Schulte (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-04-12 | ||||
3 | Celine Dey (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-04-19 | |||
4 | Vanessa Lux (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-03-16 | |||
9 | Tatjana Fandre (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-09-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Sara Allouch (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-04-21 | ||||
Paula Eigenberger (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-09-09 | ||||
Nadine Heinrich (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-07-02 | ||||
Eyline Jakubowski (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-01-29 | ||||
Julia Reh (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-12 | ||||
Marlies Sanger (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-01-31 | ||||
Dilara Turk (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-07-30 | ||||
Vicdan Yavas (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-01-20 | ||||
Annika Zoschke (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-07-04 | ||||
Antonia Päpke (until 2021-06-30) | |||||
Diana Ivonne Steinmeyer (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-04-19 | ||||
2 | Corinna Statz (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-03-14 | |||
11 | Selina Grosch (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-04-16 | |||
26 | Anina Sange (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-10-21 | |||
Mittelfeld/Sturm | |||||
13 | Trinity Kunzel (until 2021-06-30) | 2003-04-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Mayumi Loredo Ahoki (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-10-20 | ||||
Anna-Maria Nesges (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-01-29 | ||||
Beslinda Shigjeqi (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-07-31 | ||||
Louise Trapp (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-09-10 | ||||
5 | Danya Barsalona (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-01-12 | |||
14 | Kimberly Zietz (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-03-06 | |||
21 | Stephanie Gerken (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-10-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2020-09-27 14:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |