Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Markus Hogner | 1967-04-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Stina Johannes (until 2022-03-09) | 2000-01-23 | |||
28 | Lisa Klostermann (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-05-28 | |||
30 | Jil Strungmann (until 2020-08-31) | 1992-07-09 | |||
Torhüterin | |||||
20 | Kim Sindermann (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-01-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Selina Ostermeier (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-15 | |||
3 | Ella Touon (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-08-07 | |||
4 | Nina Racke (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-17 | |||
5 | Alida Dzaltur (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-08-20 | |||
11 | Irini Ioannidou (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-06-11 | |||
16 | Jacqueline Klasen (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-02-04 | |||
18 | Lena Ostermeier (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-10-01 | |||
27 | Marina Hegering (until 2020-07-04) | 1990-04-17 | |||
29 | Annalena Breitenbach (until 2020-07-06) | 1998-03-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Elisa Senß (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-10-01 | |||
7 | Antonia Baass (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-05-07 | |||
8 | Manjou Wilde (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-04-19 | |||
10 | Eleni Markou (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-03-29 | |||
13 | Barbara Brecht (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-06-12 | |||
13 | Ramona Petzelberger (until 2020-08-31) | 1992-11-13 | |||
14 | Mara Grutkamp (until 2020-12-31) | 2000-12-11 | |||
19 | Lena Sophie Oberdorf (until 2020-07-04) | 2001-12-19 | |||
21 | Ina Lehmann (until 2020-08-31) | 1990-02-05 | |||
22 | Sophia Thiemann (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-07-11 | |||
23 | Estelle Laurier (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-01-16 | |||
24 | Laureta Elmazi (until 2021-06-30) | 2003-06-26 | |||
25 | Maria Cristina Lange (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-05-11 | |||
27 | Katharina Piljic (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-09-05 | |||
31 | Jana Feldkamp (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-03-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Kirsten Nesse (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-10-06 | |||
10 | Natasha Kowalski (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-06-12 | |||
17 | Nicole Anyomi (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-02-10 | |||
19 | Beke Sterner (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-02-22 | |||
21 | Jill Baijings (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-02-23 | |||
30 | Carlotta Wamser (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-11-01 | |||
33 | Turid Knaak (until 2020-08-04) | 1991-01-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2020-10-31 17:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |