Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainerin | |||||
Laura Marienfeld (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Trainer | |||||
Sebastian Middeke (until 2021-06-30) | 1984-02-02 | ||||
Ersin Ekiz (from 2021-04-19) (until 2021-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Juliane Bauch (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-06-30 | ||||
Sabine Reinhold (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-12-29 | ||||
Gesa Schulte (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-04-05 | ||||
27 | Wiebke Willebrandt (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-01-16 | |||
28 | Josephine Plehn (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-11-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Lisa Rinke (until 2021-06-30) | |||||
Lisa Klemann (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-08-08 | ||||
Laura Hoffmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-08-12 | ||||
Annika Broker (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-01-21 | ||||
2 | Madita Sommer (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
3 | Corinna Dubbel (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-03-20 | |||
6 | Saskia Finzel (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-03-04 | |||
8 | Anne-Catherine Kufner (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-08-26 | |||
10 | Lara Plastwich (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-10-05 | |||
14 | Paula Peck (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-10-15 | |||
23 | Anna Tautz (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-05-01 | |||
25 | Elisa Kschiedel (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-04-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Helene Sertznig (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-06-06 | ||||
Antonia Dumancic (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-09-03 | ||||
Katharina Riehl (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-06-22 | ||||
Carolin Dej (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-01-05 | ||||
Lisa Winter (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-10-14 | ||||
Laura Wolenin (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-12-26 | ||||
Mia Bedarf (until 2021-06-30) | |||||
4 | Juliane Wrede (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-08-27 | |||
11 | Annalena Krapp (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-02-17 | |||
13 | Anna Spitthoff (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-09-04 | |||
17 | Sophia Meyer (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-12-13 | |||
18 | Marie Grothe (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-04-18 | |||
19 | Daniela Liessem (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-05-08 | |||
22 | Lisa Belen Zensen (until 2021-06-30) | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Naomi Densing (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-06-01 | ||||
Louisa Follert (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-05-13 | ||||
Kathrin Schroder (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-08-12 | ||||
Julia Cieslik (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-09-28 | ||||
7 | Julia Gödecke (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-10-07 | |||
9 | Jennifer Kaleja (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-06-13 | |||
12 | Sandra Ehrhardt (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-03-29 | |||
20 | Lynn Bille Sommer (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-07-29 | |||
26 | Leonie Witt (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-04-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2020-09-26 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2020-11-01 11:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |