Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Marchel Weenk (from 2022-06-01) (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Markus Schneiders (from 2021-10-18) (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Reymond Verboom (from 2022-03-20) (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Sammy Messalkhi (until 2021-10-05) | |||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Taner Demir (from 2021-10-06) (until 2021-10-17) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Frauke Meteling (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-06-08 | ||||
1 | Lara Wigger (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-07-01 | |||
16 | Leonie Doege (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-02-20 | |||
Torhüterin | |||||
Maud Houwers (from 2022-06-01) (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
20 | Joana Gutke (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-01-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Laura Rekus (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-02-23 | ||||
Jana Schmeinck (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-01-10 | ||||
Marita Hund (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-05-21 | ||||
5 | Isabel Hochstein (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-04-20 | |||
13 | Vanessa Martini (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-09-26 | |||
14 | Frauke Kaplon (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-02 | |||
15 | Wiebke Terwege (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-10-12 | |||
19 | Ines Ridder (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-12-17 | |||
24 | Barakissa Coulibaly (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-01-01 | |||
27 | Aileen Gobel (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-03-13 | |||
32 | Anna Hoyer (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-10-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mara Lensing (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-08-11 | ||||
3 | Lea Wilting (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-22 | |||
3 | Marlene De Kleine (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-03-03 | |||
4 | Celine Preuss (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-12-14 | |||
6 | Jolina Opladen (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-08 | |||
6 | Anouk Linders (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
7 | Julia-Lani Csordas (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-11 | |||
8 | Jette ter Horst (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-07-09 | |||
9 | Bente Fischer (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-11-27 | |||
10 | Jana Schwanekamp (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-03-19 | |||
17 | Ana Oliveira Leite (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-10-23 | |||
18 | Carmen Koens (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-11-12 | |||
20 | Vesna Milivojević (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-12-27 | |||
23 | Nina Lange (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-07-14 | |||
30 | Melina Glouhtchev (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-09-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Nele Szymkowiak (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-06-12 | ||||
Hanna Hamdi (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-11-26 | ||||
5 | Christina Edwards (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-02-12 | |||
7 | Isabel Pfeiffer (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-07 | |||
11 | Kaily Orriëns (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-07-25 | |||
22 | Helena Schaffeld (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-06-04 | |||
25 | Edina Habibovic (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-11-06 | |||
26 | Sarah Grunheid (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-09-27 | |||
29 | Michelle Buning (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-09-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2021-08-23 18:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-25 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |