Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Johannes Fritsch (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-07-23 | ||||
David Pietrzyk (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-02-26) | 1989-12-17 | ||||
Torhüterin | |||||
Inga Buchholz (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-05-02 | ||||
Julia Haake (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-20 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dilara Agac (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-20 | ||||
Selina Grosch (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-04-16 | ||||
Nadine Heinrich (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-07-02 | ||||
Anja Kahler (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1987-06-26 | ||||
Anina Sange (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-10-21 | ||||
Marlies Sanger (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-31 | ||||
Hulya Kaya (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-09-21 | ||||
Kimberly Zietz (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-03-06 | ||||
Celine Dey (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-04-19 | ||||
Vanessa Lux (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-16 | ||||
Julia Reh (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-05-12 | ||||
Beslinda Shigjeqi (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-07-31 | ||||
Corinna Statz (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-14 | ||||
Louise Trapp (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-10 | ||||
Danya Barsalona (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-01-12 | ||||
Stephanie Gerken (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-10-02 | ||||
Trinity Kunzel (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-04-02 | ||||
Jullien Ramirez (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Cindy Hagen (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-13 | ||||
Tatjana Fandre (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-09-16 | ||||
Maren Huelsekopf (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-06-18 | ||||
Nadine König (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-09-03 | ||||
Elisa Lindacher (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-07-22 | ||||
Jessica Purps (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-07-09 | ||||
Sara Allouch (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-04-21 | ||||
Katharina Gessner (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-09-24 | ||||
Julia Grunky (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-06-26 | ||||
Judith Mengel (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-08-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2021-08-22 14:00 |
3 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |