Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Begunk (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Torhüterin | |||||
Emma Nentwich (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-07-26 | ||||
Kira Bahr (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Caja Paulsen (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-04-11 | |||
1 | Chiara Leimgrübler (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-07 | |||
19 | Victoria Bendt (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-07-23 | |||
22 | Lena Kollmer (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jasmin Grosnick (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-08-24 | ||||
Johanna Labuj (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-10-01 | ||||
Leonie Kuhrt (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-08-03 | ||||
Luisa Erbar (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-02-13 | ||||
Helene Braren (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-26 | ||||
Alena Imgrund (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-03-10 | ||||
Sina Meyer (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-29 | ||||
Jule Ziegler (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-07-04 | ||||
Luiza Zimmermann (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-09 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Vita Onderka (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-04-14 | ||||
Alia Redant (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-02-20 | ||||
Laetitia Mikolassek (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-02-20 | ||||
Jasmine Grapengeter (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-04-24 | ||||
Paula Marie Harder (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Alina-Sophie Steiner (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-05-31 | ||||
Lisa Wiedemann (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-01-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld/Sturm | |||||
Sarah Begunk (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-04-23 | ||||
Jorina Günther (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-10-14 | ||||
Melissa Moller (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-02-10 | ||||
Madita Thien (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-02-28 | ||||
Ronja Jurgensen (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-10-14 | ||||
Sandra Melanie Krohn (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Tabea Lycke (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-02-22 | ||||
Karoline Meyer (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-11-23 | ||||
Emily Schöllknecht (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Lina Staben (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-05-04 | ||||
Madita Bethke (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-04 | ||||
Samanta Carone (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-04-23 | ||||
Magdalena Germeroth (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-02-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jill Biesold (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2022-08-22 18:01 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |