Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainerin | |||||
Kyra Malinowski | 1993-01-20 | ||||
Torhüterin | |||||
Lara Heidemeyer (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-04-08 | ||||
Antonia Pimentel-Bauer (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Carolin-Sophie Harling (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-03-21 | ||||
Josephine Plehn (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-11-27 | ||||
Laura Seljimi (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Konstantina Kalientzidou (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
18 | Julia Matuszek (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-04-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Ann-Sophie Vogel (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-09-13 | ||||
Alina Busshuven (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-25 | ||||
Tracy Boahen (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-01-30 | ||||
Nele Schmidt (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-27 | ||||
Jennifer Brinkert (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-05-10 | ||||
Maja Hunnemeyer (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-24 | ||||
Aileen Gobel (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-03-13 | ||||
Wiebke Neuhaus (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-08-02 | ||||
Pia Sophie Rybacki (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-05-10 | ||||
Janine Angrick (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-06-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Joy Demirovski (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-03-21 | ||||
Carolin Dej (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-01-05 | ||||
Lena Franke (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-02 | ||||
Pia Beyer (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-08-06 | ||||
Nursen Yaprak (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-04-26 | ||||
Mara Wilhelm (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-12-29 | ||||
Melanie Heep (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-01-24 | ||||
Celine Demironal (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-15 | ||||
Alessandra Vogel (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-06-07 | ||||
Amelie Folsing (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-12-29 | ||||
Carina Grendel (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-20 | ||||
22 | Carina Reis (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
31 | Franziska Wenzel | 1998-06-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Gizem Kilic (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-06-12 | ||||
Svenja Streller (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | ||||
Nisrine Maria Zerioul (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-05 | ||||
Lynn Bille Sommer (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-07-29 | ||||
Anja Kirsten (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-10-02 | ||||
Julia Kirsten (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
11 | Anna Maiwald (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-03-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2022-08-22 18:01 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-09-11 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |