Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andre Wachter (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-06-21 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Sven Kahlert (until 2012-09-11) | 1970-10-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Kai Rennich (until 2014-06-30) | 1978-04-11 | ||||
Philipp Dahm (until 2012-09-11) | 1979-05-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Nadine Angerer (until 2013-06-30) | 1978-11-10 | |||
26 | Desiree Schumann (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-02-06 | |||
30 | Anne-Kathrine Kremer (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-12-30 | |||
34 | Amanda Stahl (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-01-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Gina Lewandowski (from 2011-08-31) (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-04-13 | |||
3 | Valeria Kleiner (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-03-27 | |||
4 | Saki Kumagai (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-10-17 | |||
5 | Sara Thunebro (until 2013-03-27) | 1979-04-26 | |||
13 | Catharina Schmucker (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-11-25 | |||
14 | Ali Krieger (from 2011-08-05) (until 2012-12-31) | 1984-07-28 | |||
15 | Svenja Huth (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-01-25 | |||
17 | Anne Rheinheimer (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-02-26 | |||
20 | Jasmin Herbert (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-05-02 | |||
23 | Ria Percival (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-12-07 | |||
25 | Saskia Bartusiak (until 2017-06-30) | 1982-09-09 | |||
29 | Larissa Gordel (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-02-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Melanie Behringer (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
8 | Kim Kulig (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-04-09 | |||
10 | Dzsenifer Marozsan (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-04-18 | |||
12 | Meike Weber (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-03-30 | |||
16 | Deniz Ozer (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-03-02 | |||
18 | Kerstin Garefrekes (until 2016-06-30) | 1979-09-04 | |||
19 | Fatmire Bajramaj (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-04-01 | |||
24 | Theresa Panfil (until 2012-06-30) | 1995-11-13 | |||
27 | Mirella Junker (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-07-02 | |||
32 | Jessica Reinhardt (until 2012-06-30) | 1994-06-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
6 | Silvana Chojnowski (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-04-17 | |||
11 | Jessica Landstrom (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-12-12 | |||
21 | Ana-Maria Crnogorcevic (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-10-03 | |||
28 | Sandra Smisek (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-07-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2011-09-11 14:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-10-30 11:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-12-04 13:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-04-08 13:00 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2012-05-12 16:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |