Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Kai Kubierske (until 2012-06-30) | |||||
Trainer | |||||
Doreen Meier (until 2012-06-30) | 1968-11-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Huth (until 2012-06-30) | |||||
Torhüterin | |||||
1 | Anna Klink (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-03-22 | |||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lisa Schmitz (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-05-04 | |||
22 | Katharina Geuer (until 2012-06-30) | 1995-01-07 | |||
25 | Pepa Jaeschke (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-05-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Audrey Knopp (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-12-31 | |||
3 | Johanna Elsig (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-11-01 | |||
5 | Teresa Tullmann (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-08-10 | |||
6 | Henrike Sahlmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-02-21 | |||
9 | Merle Barth (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-04-21 | |||
13 | Marith Prießen (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-12-17 | |||
18 | Stephanie Mpalaskas (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-02-12 | |||
26 | Feride Bakir (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-06-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Kathrin Hendrich (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-04-06 | |||
6 | Claudia Kalin (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-09-07 | |||
7 | Natalie Moik (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-08-11 | |||
14 | Carolin Dej (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-01-05 | |||
16 | Melanie Heep (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-01-24 | |||
17 | Marina Hegering (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-04-17 | |||
21 | Francesca Weber (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-01-28 | |||
24 | Lena Steinbach (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-10-22 | |||
28 | Arzu Karabulut (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-01-30 | |||
30 | Sally Shipard (from 2012-01-30) (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-10-20 | |||
31 | Susanne Kasperczyk (until 2013-08-30) | 1985-08-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Shelley Thompson (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-02-08 | |||
10 | Turid Knaak (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-01-24 | |||
11 | Eunice Beckmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-02-08 | |||
15 | Mandana Knopf (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-06-25 | |||
19 | Lisa Schwab (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-05-30 | |||
23 | Isabelle Linden (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-01-15 | |||
33 | Katie Bethke (from 2012-01-14) (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-09-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2011-09-11 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |