Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Bernd Lindrath (until 2014-06-30) | 1959-09-13 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Kraus (from 2012-01-30) (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-05-11 | ||||
Martina Voss-Tecklenburg (until 2012-01-29) | 1967-12-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Katja Greulich (from 2012-02-17) (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-03-25 | ||||
Daniel Kraus (until 2012-01-29) | 1984-05-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tessa Rinkes (from 2012-01-26) (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-09-14 | |||
12 | Klara Muhle (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-01-27 | |||
28 | Katja Schroffenegger (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-04-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Mirte Roelvink (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-11-23 | |||
3 | Saskia Schwarz (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-11-23 | |||
4 | Julia Arnold (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-11-10 | |||
5 | Jofie Stubing (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-06-05 | |||
8 | Sara Loser (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-03-30 | |||
11 | Kathleen Radtke (until 2013-02-28) | 1985-01-31 | |||
23 | Laura Brosius (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-01-08 | |||
33 | Carolin Schiewe (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-10-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Susann Utes (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-01-04 | |||
13 | Sylvia Arnold (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-11-10 | |||
14 | Nadine Kraus (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-02-14 | |||
15 | Fata Salkunic (from 2011-09-09) (until 2012-01-26) | 1991-03-09 | |||
16 | Stephanie Milde (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-05-09 | |||
17 | Lisa Seiler (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-10-09 | |||
18 | Vivien Beil (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-12-12 | |||
19 | Iva Landeka (from 2012-01-21) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-10-03 | |||
21 | Maxi Lehnard (until 2012-06-30) | 1995-08-19 | |||
22 | Karoline Heinze (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-10-15 | |||
25 | Marlyse Ngo Ndoumbouk (until 2011-08-30) | 1985-01-03 | |||
29 | Louisa Lagaris (until 2012-06-30) | 1995-02-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Sabrina Schmutzler (until 2014-12-31) | 1984-10-07 | |||
9 | Sabine Treml (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-07-21 | |||
10 | Amber Hearn (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-11-28 | |||
27 | Saskia Lehnert (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-12-31 | |||
28 | Christiane Gotte (from 2012-05-28) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-04-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2011-08-14 14:00 |
1 : 10 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2011-09-10 15:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-10-30 14:00 |
2 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |