Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Fabian Lucas (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-07-29 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Kellermann (until 2017-06-30) | 1968-09-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Pichatzek (until 2014-06-30) | 1962-10-05 | ||||
Mark Oliver Stricker (until 2013-06-30) | 1972-04-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Alisa Vetterlein (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-10-22 | |||
12 | Jana Burmeister (until 2020-07-30) | 1989-03-06 | |||
24 | Jaime Souza (until 2012-02-29) | 1986-01-02 | |||
29 | Merle Frohms (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-01-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sarah Fischer (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-09-22 | ||||
Selina Wagner (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-06 | ||||
6 | Maren Tetzlaff (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-08-03 | |||
16 | Rebecca Smith (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-06-17 | |||
17 | Laura Vetterlein (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-04-07 | |||
17 | Sahra Freimuth (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-05-07 | |||
20 | Stephanie Bunte (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-02-14 | |||
22 | Verena Faißt (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-05-22 | |||
27 | Josephine Henning (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-09-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Katri Nokso-Koivisto (until 2011-12-31) | 1982-11-22 | |||
3 | Zsanett Jakabfi (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-02-18 | |||
7 | Martina Moser (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-04-09 | |||
8 | Eve Chandraratne (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-06-20 | |||
9 | Anna Blasse (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-02-27 | |||
10 | Selina Wagner (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-06 | |||
11 | Melissa Thiem (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-08-11 | |||
11 | Leni Kaurin (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-03-21 | |||
13 | Nadine Kessler (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-04-04 | |||
18 | Ivonne Hartmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-09-15 | |||
19 | Andrea Wilkens (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-10-16 | |||
21 | Nathalie Bock (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-10-21 | |||
23 | Navina Omilade (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-11-03 | |||
28 | Lena Goessling (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-03-08 | |||
30 | Franziska Fiebig (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-04-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
25 | Martina Muller (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-04-18 | |||
26 | Conny Pohlers (until 2013-06-11) | 1978-11-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2011-09-11 14:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-10-30 11:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |