Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Martin Bieser (until 2015-06-30) | 1968-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Isabel Findling (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-03-26 | ||||
41 | Celina Geiss (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-06-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Claudia Eckstein (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-04-03 | ||||
Sarah Jainta (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-01-29 | ||||
Nora Steinhilp (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-08-02 | ||||
13 | Julia Becker (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-04-30 | |||
14 | Laura Couto-Rodriguez (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-02-14 | |||
17 | Eileen Nauert (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-02-16 | |||
24 | Miriam Schonbein (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-01-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Lisa Baumann (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-07-31 | ||||
Dilay Baz (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-03-24 | ||||
Mareike Beckert (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-06-07 | ||||
Xenia Buscher (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-07-06 | ||||
Karen Cosic (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-09-21 | ||||
Nathalie Deck (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-02-17 | ||||
Iavna Drazic (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-07-28 | ||||
Rebecca Dups (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-02-25 | ||||
Carmen Fetzner (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-05-27 | ||||
Jacqueline Goutier (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-10-20 | ||||
Juliette Haase (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-05-13 | ||||
Melanie Kaiser (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-03-17 | ||||
Natalie Klupp (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-12-20 | ||||
Anna Kostel (until 2013-06-30) | 1995-03-25 | ||||
Jeanette Martinez Seeger (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-12-01 | ||||
Antonia Ohnemus (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-01-29 | ||||
Melina Pakhotin (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-08-25 | ||||
Julia Rentschler (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-09-26 | ||||
Magda Reuter (until 2013-06-30) | 1995-12-01 | ||||
Vanessa Stegmuller (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-11-16 | ||||
Dilek Zengin (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-07-05 | ||||
Mona Kumm (until 2013-06-30) | |||||
11 | Ramona Bohnet (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-09-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Monika Falk (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-12-04 | ||||
16 | Sarah Heilig (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-05-23 | |||
19 | Anja Giraud (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-11-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-08-26 14:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |