Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Kontra (until 2014-06-30) | 1971-12-15 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Sven Kahlert (from 2013-03-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-10-14 | ||||
Petra Hauser (from 2012-10-29) (until 2013-02-28) | 1971-01-15 | ||||
Marco Ketelaer (until 2012-10-28) | 1969-07-18 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Annemieke Kiesel (from 2013-03-17) (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-11-30 | ||||
Andreas Kontra (until 2013-06-30) | 1971-12-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Ashlyn Harris (until 2013-02-23) | 1985-10-19 | |||
12 | Meike Kamper (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-04-23 | |||
24 | Chiara Kirstein (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-09-08 | |||
28 | Christina Bellinghoven (from 2013-03-24) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-08-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Isabel Schenk (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-01-08 | |||
5 | Alice Hellfeier (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-10-29 | |||
13 | Elena Hauer (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-02-13 | |||
15 | Laura Neboli (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-03-14 | |||
20 | Julia Debitzki (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-06-25 | |||
21 | Marina Himmighofen (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-11-11 | |||
27 | Elli Reed (from 2012-08-05) (until 2013-01-30) | 1989-08-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Barbara Muller (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-03-03 | |||
4 | Nina Windmuller (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-11-08 | |||
6 | Jennifer Oster (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-03-02 | |||
7 | Jackie Groenen (until 2013-12-31) | 1994-12-17 | |||
8 | Gulhiye Cengiz (until 2013-12-31) | 1992-04-14 | |||
10 | Linda Bresonik (until 2012-07-25) | 1983-12-07 | |||
14 | Dolores Silva (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-08-07 | |||
17 | Vanessa Wahlen (until 2014-09-09) | 1995-08-21 | |||
18 | Geldona Morina (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-11-08 | |||
22 | Daria Streng (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-05-22 | |||
26 | Kozue Ando (until 2013-01-30) | 1982-07-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Mandy Islacker (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-08-08 | |||
18 | Gurbet Kalkan (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-01-08 | |||
19 | Stefanie Weichelt (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-08-23 | |||
23 | Sarah Schmitz (from 2013-01-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-12-12 | |||
23 | Lieke Martens (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-12-16 | |||
25 | Nicole Banecki (until 2013-01-30) | 1988-09-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-10-07 14:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-11-18 14:00 |
1 : 8 |
Schema Compare |