Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Dirk Heinrichs (until 2013-06-30) | 1968-05-20 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Schroder (until 2016-06-30) | 1942-07-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dirk Heinrichs (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-05-20 | ||||
Aferdita Podvorica (until 2014-06-30) | 1978-09-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Alyssa Naeher (until 2013-06-18) | 1988-04-20 | |||
24 | Anna-Felicitas Sarholz (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-07-05 | |||
32 | Ann-Katrin Berger (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sandra Wiegand (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-04-15 | ||||
2 | Kristin Demann (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-04-07 | |||
3 | Wibke Meister (until 2013-06-30) | 1995-05-12 | |||
4 | Johanna Elsig (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-11-01 | |||
5 | Maren Mjelde (from 2013-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-11-06 | |||
8 | Sandra Wiegand (until 2012-12-31) | 1992-04-15 | |||
14 | Jennifer Zietz (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-09-14 | |||
15 | Inka Wesely (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-05-10 | |||
18 | Alex Singer (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-11-18 | |||
22 | Stefanie Draws (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-10-16 | |||
26 | Heleen Jaques (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-04-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Keelin Winters (until 2012-12-31) | 1988-12-09 | |||
7 | Sara Doorsoun (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-11-17 | |||
8 | Andrine Stolsmo Hegerberg (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-06-06 | |||
10 | Patricia Hanebeck (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-02-26 | |||
11 | Jennifer Cramer (until 2018-06-03) | 1993-02-24 | |||
16 | Natasa Andonova (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-12-04 | |||
19 | Antonia Goransson (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-09-16 | |||
20 | Stefanie Mirlach (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-04-18 | |||
21 | Tabea Kemme (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-12-14 | |||
23 | Lidija Kulis (until 2013-03-17) | 1992-05-02 | |||
29 | Jeannette Yango (from 2012-08-25) (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-06-12 | |||
31 | Pauline Bremer (from 2012-12-02) (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-04-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
5 | Erica Dillmann (until 2012-12-31) | 1994-02-07 | |||
9 | Ada Hegerberg (from 2013-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-07-10 | |||
9 | Chantal de Ridder (until 2013-01-17) | 1989-01-19 | |||
17 | Yūki Ōgimi (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-07-15 | |||
25 | Lisa Evans (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-05-21 | |||
27 | Sandra Starke (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-07-31 | |||
30 | Genoveva Anonma (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-04-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-10-07 14:00 |
5 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2012-11-17 13:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-12-16 11:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-03-03 13:00 |
4 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-05-19 16:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |