Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Bellon (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-02-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Niko Koutroubis (until 2013-12-30) | 1969-08-23 | ||||
Niko Koutroubis (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1969-08-23 | ||||
Trainerin | |||||
Theresa Merk (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-10-25 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Mustafa Cakal (until 2013-06-30) | 1970-01-01 | ||||
Robert Keser (until 2012-12-31) | 1972-09-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Simone Holder (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-12-26 | |||
1 | Alisa Geiger (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-08-17 | |||
12 | Pascale Kuffer (until 2012-12-31) | 1992-11-13 | |||
13 | Kristina Schnull (until 2014-06-30) | 1977-03-09 | |||
25 | Jessica Konig (until 2012-12-31) | 1994-05-07 | |||
33 | Alisa Geiger (until 2013-12-31) | 1996-08-17 | |||
33 | Saskia Frensch (until 2013-06-30) | 1998-02-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Bianca Brosamle (until 2013-06-30) | 1997-04-11 | |||
3 | Selin Munz (until 2013-06-30) | 1997-05-04 | |||
3 | Larissa Laich (until 2012-12-31) | 1995-08-08 | |||
4 | Paula Vorbeck (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-03-28 | |||
4 | Catharina Schwagler (until 2012-12-31) | 1994-07-26 | |||
5 | Bianca Blochl (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-24 | |||
5 | Bianca Blochl (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-01-24 | |||
11 | Michelle Worner (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-03-25 | |||
12 | Seila Delalic (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-10-13 | |||
14 | Maximiliane Rall (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-11-18 | |||
23 | Susanna Holler (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-04-25 | |||
24 | Sandra Betschart (until 2013-03-31) | 1989-03-30 | |||
26 | Lea Radle (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-01-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Hilal Genc (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-08-12 | |||
7 | Nicole Loipersberger (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-01-01 | |||
7 | Aline Bohringer (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-12-20 | |||
7 | Gina Rilling (until 2013-06-30) | 1998-12-24 | |||
8 | Elisabeth Tieber (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-07-04 | |||
8 | Meike Bessner (until 2013-06-30) | 1998-07-15 | |||
9 | Natalia Mann (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-11-14 | |||
9 | Anna Vidovenyecz (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-12-15 | |||
10 | Athanasia Moraitou (until 2013-06-30) | 1997-04-02 | |||
13 | Raphaela Niemz (until 2013-06-30) | 1997-11-07 | |||
14 | Jasmin Ballach (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-11-26 | |||
15 | Sonja Laukemper (until 2013-06-30) | 1996-06-01 | |||
15 | Emilie Rapp (until 2013-06-30) | 1997-02-08 | |||
16 | Tamina Stecinsky (until 2013-06-30) | 1997-09-19 | |||
17 | Lea Kronmuller (until 2013-06-30) | 1998-08-26 | |||
19 | Stefanie Grimm (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-07-10 | |||
20 | Anna-Lena Vollmer (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-04-02 | |||
21 | Julia Schneider (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-02-03 | |||
22 | Fabienne Dongus (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-05-11 | |||
27 | Jasmin Eder (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-10-08 | |||
30 | Alexandra Szarvas (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-09-07 | |||
32 | Tamar Dongus (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-05-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
10 | Merza Julevic (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-04-17 | |||
11 | Bianca Uhl (until 2013-06-30) | 1997-08-01 | |||
16 | Nina Muller (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-05-21 | |||
17 | Annika Schmidt (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-06-04 | |||
18 | Jana Spengler (until 2013-06-30) | 1995-01-30 | |||
18 | Jana Siegle (until 2013-06-30) | 1998-02-16 | |||
29 | Julia Steger (until 2012-12-31) | 1994-08-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-08-26 11:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-10-07 16:00 |
6 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |