Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Kargus (until 2014-06-30) | 1963-06-20 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Worle (until 2019-06-30) | 1982-02-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Thorsten Zaunmuller (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-05-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Franziska Kutzner (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-03-17 | ||||
1 | Kathrin Langert (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-06-04 | |||
37 | Bianca Henninger (from 2013-08-30) (until 2013-12-31) | 1990-10-22 | |||
38 | Veronika Gratz (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-05-25 | |||
39 | Katja Schroffenegger (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-04-28 | |||
41 | Fabienne Weber (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-11-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Carolin Bader (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-09-10 | ||||
Christina Fink (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-05-29 | ||||
Anna Schlarb (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-04-04 | ||||
Michaela Specht (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-02-15 | ||||
Sophie Wunderlich (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-07-16 | ||||
Stefanie Zinner (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-03-26 | ||||
2 | Gina Lewandowski (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-04-13 | |||
3 | Niki Cross (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-05-30 | |||
4 | Clara Schone (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-07-06 | |||
5 | Valeria Kleiner (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-03-27 | |||
6 | Katharina Baunach (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-01-18 | |||
15 | Nora Holstad Berge (from 2014-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-03-26 | |||
16 | Rebecca Huyleur (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-07-29 | |||
19 | Carina Wenninger (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-02-06 | |||
20 | Leonie Maier (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-09-29 | |||
21 | Raffaella Manieri (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-11-21 | |||
25 | Viktoria Schnaderbeck (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-01-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Veronika Capoccia (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-07-25 | ||||
Theresa Damm (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-09-25 | ||||
Annalena Herzog (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-03-02 | ||||
Madlen Hiereth (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-11-15 | ||||
Ricarda Kiessling (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-06-23 | ||||
Anja Pfluger (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-11-16 | ||||
Ina van der Linde (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-08-19 | ||||
9 | Vanessa Burki (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-04-01 | |||
14 | Sarah Romert (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-12-13 | |||
17 | Erika Tymrak (from 2013-08-30) (until 2013-12-31) | 1991-08-07 | |||
20 | Jana Kappes (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-10-09 | |||
22 | Olivia Schough (from 2014-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-03-11 | |||
22 | Amber Brooks (until 2013-12-31) | 1991-01-23 | |||
23 | Ricarda Walkling (until 2016-08-03) | 1997-03-19 | |||
27 | Laura Feiersinger (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-04-05 | |||
29 | Ramona Strahl (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-01-09 | |||
30 | Jenny Gaugigl (from 2013-09-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-08-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Lisa Flotzner (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-02-28 | ||||
Monika Fuss (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-11-10 | ||||
Antonia Heider (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-08-22 | ||||
Alea Roger (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-09-27 | ||||
7 | Ivana Rudelic (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-01-25 | |||
8 | Sarah Hagen (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-11-18 | |||
11 | Lena Lotzen (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-09-11 | |||
17 | Eunice Beckmann (from 2014-01-01) (until 2016-05-03) | 1992-02-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-09-29 14:00 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-11-16 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |