Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Andreas Pach (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-05-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Janine Goldbach (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-11-05 | ||||
Nina Kresse (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-03-15 | ||||
1 | Elisa Walther (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-09-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Lisa Richter (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-10-05 | ||||
Lena Turpel (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-10-08 | ||||
Annemarie Horr (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-11-10 | ||||
Anne Kuster (until 2014-06-30) | 1967-08-24 | ||||
3 | Lucie Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-06-10 | |||
6 | Kathleen Freude (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-08-22 | |||
12 | Juliana Franke (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-08-11 | |||
16 | Doreen Gloge (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-10-20 | |||
24 | Marie Lehmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-03-10 | |||
25 | Romy Naumann (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-09-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Juliette Leuschner (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-04-12 | ||||
Sonja Melzer (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-01-01 | ||||
Susann Meyer (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
Susann Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-04-09 | ||||
Sandra Rost (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
Marion Sattler (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-06-11 | ||||
Anne Schonberner (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-07-04 | ||||
Kathleen Seifert (until 2014-06-30) | 1974-10-03 | ||||
Anne van Deel (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-01-02 | ||||
Kate Carlisle (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-02-20 | ||||
Judith Knieling (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-06-13 | ||||
Paula Kohlenbrenner (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-01-17 | ||||
Janine Korn (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-12-11 | ||||
5 | Laura Beck (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-03-23 | |||
8 | Anne Engelhardt (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-03-01 | |||
18 | Linda Ottlinger (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-03-31 | |||
20 | Jessica Grethlein (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-02-26 | |||
21 | Stefanie Linke (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-02-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Linda Poppe (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-06-15 | ||||
Mandy Vogt (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
Franziska Barsch (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-08-11 | ||||
Diana Bohme (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-03-12 | ||||
Luise Broedner (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-02-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-09-01 11:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |