Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Markus Pilot (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Lietz (until 2015-06-30) | 1966-08-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Simone Ilse (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Vivien Brandt (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-09-25 | |||
12 | Marie Berwinkel-Kottmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-04-04 | |||
13 | Tessa Rinkes (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-09-14 | |||
31 | Sandra Mergelkuhl (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-02-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jessy Atila (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-02-17 | ||||
2 | Frederike Kempe (until 2015-08-01) | 1997-02-10 | |||
2 | Dana Gerhardt (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-05-21 | |||
2 | Pia Lange (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-03-09 | |||
3 | Wiebke Tepe (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-02-18 | |||
4 | Franziska Weisshaar (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-09-26 | |||
6 | Lena Luckel (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-08-09 | |||
7 | Katharina Bodeker (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-06-07 | |||
8 | Eva Huwe (until 2013-12-31) | 1987-03-27 | |||
11 | Lisanne Kleygrewe (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-02-26 | |||
16 | Pia Lange (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-03-09 | |||
21 | Jacqueline Manteas (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-08-02 | |||
23 | Katrin Posdorfer (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-03-02 | |||
24 | Pauline-Sophie Brandis (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-09-29 | |||
30 | Brigitta Schmucker (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-05-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Anna Kilwinski (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-03-19 | ||||
Angel Theiss (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-06-25 | ||||
5 | Rebecca Granz (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-01-16 | |||
13 | Melanie Ott (from 2014-02-23) (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-04-13 | |||
15 | Marina Hermes (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-01-13 | |||
17 | Shpresa Aradini | 1994-08-13 | |||
18 | Jacqueline Dunker (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-04-21 | |||
19 | Marie Pollmann (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-09-13 | |||
20 | Jana Schwanekamp (from 2014-01-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1997-03-19 | |||
20 | Patricia Pape (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-03-15 | |||
25 | Laura Liedmeier (until 2014-12-31) | 1996-12-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Josephine Giard (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-03-22 | |||
10 | Marion Grobner (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-12-26 | |||
22 | Nina Ehegotz (from 2013-10-06) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-02-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-09-01 14:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-09-29 14:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |