Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Christian Beer (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-11-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Steffen Scheler (from 2014-01-31) (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-03-28 | ||||
Christian Kehr (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Jens Schulze (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Jens Schulze (until 2015-06-30) | |||||
Patrick Mengel (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Eva-Lotta Ravn (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-09-11 | |||
12 | Julia Gornowitz (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-01-11 | |||
26 | Christina Pohl (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-12-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Johanna Kaiser (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-05-08 | |||
4 | Jackie Cruz (from 2013-11-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-12-02 | |||
5 | Lea Hippauf (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-05-06 | |||
13 | Anja Beinroth (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-02-01 | |||
17 | Paula Kubusch (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-11-11 | |||
18 | Juliane Rath (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-12-27 | |||
20 | Josefin Hoffer (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-08-08 | |||
23 | Marie Schmiedchen (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-10-24 | |||
24 | Nikoleta Bojtschewa (from 2013-08-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-08-20 | |||
25 | Julia Schramm (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-03-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Stefanie Mucke (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-03-22 | |||
3 | Theresa Weiss (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-09-28 | |||
4 | Melanie Piatkowski (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-01-04 | |||
6 | Anne Roeloffs (until 2016-06-30) | 1982-06-25 | |||
7 | Wiebke Seidler (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-12-28 | |||
8 | Melissa Krakowski (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-03-31 | |||
10 | Melanie Vogelhuber (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-03-16 | |||
11 | Tahnee Tjeerdsma (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-05-11 | |||
14 | Victoria Stein (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-12-02 | |||
21 | Katja Gabrowitsch (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-03-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Yvonne Wutzler (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-08-21 | ||||
9 | Dania Schuster (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-03-07 | |||
11 | Verena Volkmer (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-03-10 | |||
15 | Anne Bartke (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-03-02 | |||
19 | Welislawa Dimitrowa (until 2014-08-31) | 1993-10-10 | |||
22 | Stephanie Trabert (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-08-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-09-01 14:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-09-28 13:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |