Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Burkhardt Lau (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Remark (until 2015-06-30) | 1959-10-05 | ||||
Carsten Beschorner (from 2013-09-03) (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-10-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Vanessa Baudzus (until 2014-06-30) | 1978-01-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Enija Anna Vaivode (from 2014-02-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-12-18 | ||||
1 | Elena Blaser (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-09-16 | |||
22 | Julia Schurmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-06-14 | |||
28 | Kathrin Gunther (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-11-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Magdalena Konopka (from 2014-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
2 | Franziska Wendel (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-07-05 | |||
3 | Melanie Eminger (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-03-14 | |||
4 | Magdalena Schumacher (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-12-01 | |||
17 | Svenja Streller (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
18 | Angelina Weber (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-05-14 | |||
19 | Lena Wiersch (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-01-17 | |||
23 | Anne-Katrin Westphal (from 2013-10-13) (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-06-30 | |||
25 | Sophie Doll (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-09-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Luisa Deckenbrock (from 2013-12-15) (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-11-22 | ||||
Arzu Teke (from 2014-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-07-21 | ||||
Yuko Aizawa (from 2014-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-03-04 | ||||
Johanna Kuhn (from 2014-03-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-06-14 | ||||
Ines Gunther (from 2014-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-01-27 | ||||
5 | Lea Daiz (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-05-05 | |||
6 | Isabelle Huls (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-06-11 | |||
7 | Caroline Asteroth (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-12-16 | |||
10 | Lisa Umbach (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-06-09 | |||
12 | Maren Weingarz (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-10-16 | |||
13 | Sarah Krumscheid (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-09-23 | |||
16 | Eva Langenfeld (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-03-23 | |||
21 | Mara Walther (from 2013-09-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-09-21 | |||
24 | Svenja Zsolt (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-11-03 | |||
25 | Debora Vinci (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-07-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Fatbardha Sekiraca (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-10-30 | |||
9 | Jana Sebastian (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-06-29 | |||
15 | Stefanie Blazejezak (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-04-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-09-01 11:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-09-28 14:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |