Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Saban Uzun (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-05-14 | ||||
Saban Uzun (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-05-14 | ||||
Alexander Schick (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Nicole Vuk (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-02-07 | |||
13 | Janine Wesselsky (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-07-19 | |||
13 | Alin Kurutz (from 2015-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-12-03 | |||
25 | Antonia Knupfer (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-06-16 | |||
Torhüterin | |||||
1 | Saskia Frensch (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-02-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Lea Kronmuller (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-08-26 | |||
3 | Bianca Brosamle (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-04-11 | |||
4 | Selin Munz (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-05-04 | |||
5 | Bianca Blochl (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-24 | |||
5 | Jana Siegle (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-02-16 | |||
11 | Michelle Worner (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-03-25 | |||
16 | Jana Siegle (from 2015-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-02-16 | |||
18 | Lea Kronmuller (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-08-26 | |||
19 | Isabel Schlipf (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-05-05 | |||
24 | Pia Schmid (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-22 | |||
26 | Jasmin Ballach (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-11-26 | |||
28 | Paula Vorbeck (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-03-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Louisa Teufel (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-08-05 | |||
4 | Magdalena Kraft (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-04-02 | |||
6 | Tamina Stecinsky (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-09-19 | |||
6 | Janina Hechler (until 2015-06-30) | 1999-01-28 | |||
7 | Nicole Loipersberger (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-01-01 | |||
7 | Gina Rilling (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-12-24 | |||
8 | Anja Selensky (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-02-05 | |||
8 | Paula Ruess (until 2015-06-30) | 1999-10-24 | |||
9 | Fabienne Rudy (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-10-09 | |||
10 | Vivien Froschle (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-01-15 | |||
12 | Yvonne Hanselmann (until 2016-06-30) | 2000-05-01 | |||
13 | Natalie Rau (until 2015-06-30) | ||||
14 | Lea Radle (from 2015-01-31) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-01-21 | |||
14 | Selina Walter (until 2015-06-30) | 2000-01-07 | |||
15 | Emilie Rapp (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-02-08 | |||
15 | Fabienne Fay (until 2016-06-30) | 2000-06-19 | |||
16 | Janina Kern (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-03-09 | |||
16 | Lisa Rinderknecht (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-02-17 | |||
17 | Athanasia Moraitou (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-04-02 | |||
17 | Jessica Legel (until 2015-06-30) | ||||
18 | Gina Rilling (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-12-24 | |||
19 | Stefanie Grimm (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-07-10 | |||
20 | Franziska Herrmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-05-26 | |||
20 | Carina Spengler (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | |||
21 | Marie-Therese Weymer (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-08-03 | |||
22 | Aline Bohringer (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-12-20 | |||
22 | Phoebe Vilsmeier (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-07-31 | |||
23 | Lena Sender (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-07-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
2 | Sandra Borowski (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-03-06 | |||
9 | Anna Vidovenyecz (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-12-15 | |||
11 | Selina Martens (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-01-09 | |||
16 | Nina Muller (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-05-21 | |||
18 | Julia Rudolph (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-12-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2014-08-23 14:00 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |