Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Imbach (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Lisa Brenner (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-10-29 | ||||
Natalie Jost (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-07-14 | ||||
Vera Korm (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-05-23 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Mandana Buscher (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-12-03 | ||||
Dajana Kremer (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-05-26 | ||||
Maria Bienentreu (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-02-28 | ||||
Clara Thaleiser-Schuch (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-10-28 | ||||
Eileen Jakobi (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-01-14 | ||||
Laura Esser (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-06-01 | ||||
Valerie von Zahn (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-11-13 | ||||
Melanie Kieckhofel (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-04-18 | ||||
Jule Brockerhoff (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-06-29 | ||||
23 | Natalie Kreitz | 1995-12-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marina Buschinski (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-10-18 | ||||
Nicola Leonnie Wilke (until 2017-06-30) | |||||
Vanessa Mehlem (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-12-03 | ||||
Assunta Sarago (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-06-08 | ||||
Elisea Brancato (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-07-13 | ||||
Dounia Ablali (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-09-01 | ||||
Marina Spuzic (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-10-19 | ||||
8 | Catia Alves Pereira (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Birsen Karamahmut (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-01-13 | ||||
Fiona Mc Cormick (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-08-26 | ||||
Madelaine Kluser (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-12-30 | ||||
Michelle Fischer (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-08-20 | ||||
Hannah Davids (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-01-23 | ||||
Katharina Raichle (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-12-24 | ||||
Hanna Lahr (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-06-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2015-08-23 14:00 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |