Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christian Pohlmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1980-08-15 | ||||
Co-Trainerin | |||||
Britta Hainke (until 2016-06-30) | 1968-03-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Vivien Brandt (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-09-25 | |||
12 | Marie Berwinkel-Kottmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-04-04 | |||
12 | Jule Krutzmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-09-29 | |||
26 | Alisa Ostwald (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-07-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Frederike Kempe (until 2015-08-01) | 1997-02-10 | |||
3 | Wiebke Tepe (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-02-18 | |||
3 | Maj Sandmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-04-13 | |||
6 | Lena Luckel (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-08-09 | |||
7 | Katharina Bodeker (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-06-07 | |||
14 | Jill Eis (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-09-19 | |||
16 | Pia Lange (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-03-09 | |||
18 | Jacqueline Dunker (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-04-21 | |||
20 | Nina Lange (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-07-14 | |||
21 | Jacqueline Manteas (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-08-02 | |||
22 | Laura Hoffmann (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-08-12 | |||
23 | Katrin Posdorfer (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-03-02 | |||
24 | Pauline-Sophie Brandis (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-09-29 | |||
30 | Brigitta Schmucker (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-05-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Ina Teltenkotter (until 2016-01-01) | 1998-02-20 | |||
7 | Annabel Jager (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-01-06 | |||
8 | Magdalena Richter (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-07-07 | |||
10 | Hjordis Nusken (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-04-03 | |||
13 | Melanie Ott (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-04-13 | |||
15 | Marina Hermes (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-01-13 | |||
17 | Shpresa Aradini | 1994-08-13 | |||
17 | Svenja Horenbaum (from 2016-03-20) (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-01-20 | |||
18 | Lara Hohm (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-09-13 | |||
19 | Marie Pollmann (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-09-13 | |||
21 | Sarah Grunheid (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-09-27 | |||
24 | Geldona Morina (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-11-08 | |||
25 | Lea Carolin Tschope (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-01-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Josephine Giard (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-03-22 | |||
11 | Annalena Rieke (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-01-10 | |||
27 | Carolin Turck (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-03-16 | |||
28 | Isabelle Wolf (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-12-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2015-08-23 11:00 |
0 : 12 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-09-27 14:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |