Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sabrina Gesell (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
Andreas Billetter (until 2016-06-30) | 1973-09-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
- | Dennis Bieschke (until 2016-06-30) | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lara-Celine Stober (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-10-31 | |||
1 | Maike Vogler (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-06-06 | |||
18 | Anna Wegscheider (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-11-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Janne Moths (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
Michelle Noetzel (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-01-06 | ||||
Sarah Schubart (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-03-02 | ||||
2 | Franziska Brockl (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-06-13 | |||
3 | Nathalie Bock (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-11-07 | |||
4 | Laura Kill (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-11-22 | |||
5 | Chantal Meissner (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-09-14 | |||
5 | Sara-Lena Scholte (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-03-10 | |||
5 | Adelina Neziri (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-01-08 | |||
13 | Anna Tatenhorst (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-04-28 | |||
15 | Wiebke Neuhaus (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-08-02 | |||
22 | Carina Grendel (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-09-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Julia Schlonski (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-02-24 | ||||
Ann-Sophie Vogel (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-09-13 | ||||
Juliane Wiemann (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-11-30 | ||||
Mara Wilhelm (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-12-29 | ||||
Oliwia Wos (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-08-15 | ||||
Celina Buczkowski (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-06-07 | ||||
Sina Diekmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-06-05 | ||||
8 | Daniela Liessem (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-05-08 | |||
13 | Nadine Kraus (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-02-14 | |||
14 | Tiana Kalamanda (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-07-22 | |||
16 | Melanie Heep (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-01-24 | |||
20 | Laura Buczkowski (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-06-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Johanna Behrens (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-09-09 | ||||
Angelina Bruck (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-09-22 | ||||
Marie Lummer (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-06-20 | ||||
9 | Merja Kurz (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-04-16 | |||
11 | Jennifer Steinbruck (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-11-18 | |||
12 | Anna Maiwald (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-03-13 | |||
17 | Burcu Ozkanca (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-01-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2015-08-22 15:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |