Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Saban Uzun (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-05-14 | ||||
Saban Uzun (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-05-14 | ||||
Alexander Schick (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
Matthias Kipke (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
Torhüterin | |||||
1 | Louisa Binley (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-05-07 | |||
1 | Laura Pawlowski (until 2017-06-30) | 2001-10-03 | |||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Nicole Vuk (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-02-07 | |||
1 | Antonia Knupfer (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-06-16 | |||
13 | Besarta Leci (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-10-14 | |||
13 | Janine Wesselsky (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-07-19 | |||
13 | Alin Kurutz (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-12-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Isabel Schlipf (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-05-05 | ||||
Lexington Nicole MC Lellan (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
2 | Lea Kronmuller (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-08-26 | |||
3 | Bianca Brosamle (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-04-11 | |||
4 | Selin Munz (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-05-04 | |||
4 | Kerstin Bogenschutz (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-01-26 | |||
5 | Bianca Blochl (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-24 | |||
11 | Michelle Worner (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-03-25 | |||
16 | Jana Siegle (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-02-16 | |||
19 | Isabel Schlipf (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-05-05 | |||
24 | Pia Schmid (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-22 | |||
26 | Jasmin Ballach (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-11-26 | |||
28 | Paula Vorbeck (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-03-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dorentina Mucici (from 2016-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-09-13 | ||||
Julia Amendt (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
Kim Weiss (from 2015-12-05) (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
- | Lena Leis (until 2016-06-30) | 2000-12-08 | |||
- | Delina Onur (until 2016-06-30) | 2000-04-12 | |||
- | Lilian Ruckaberle (until 2016-06-30) | 2001-06-10 | |||
3 | Louisa Teufel (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-08-05 | |||
4 | Paula Ruess (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-10-24 | |||
5 | Sandra Westram (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-01-18 | |||
6 | Tamina Stecinsky (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-09-19 | |||
6 | Judith Alt (until 2016-06-30) | 2000-10-12 | |||
7 | Nicole Loipersberger (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-01-01 | |||
7 | Luise Fritz (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-02-02 | |||
7 | Gina Rilling (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-12-24 | |||
8 | Anja Selensky (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-02-05 | |||
8 | Leunora Pilana (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-04-23 | |||
9 | Matea Grgic (until 2017-06-30) | ||||
10 | Vivien Froschle (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-01-15 | |||
10 | Madlen Weinhardt (from 2016-01-28) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-09-26 | |||
11 | Lena Tarmann (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-03-12 | |||
11 | Lea Egner (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-04-16 | |||
12 | Yvonne Hanselmann (until 2016-06-30) | 2000-05-01 | |||
13 | Sara Muller (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-03-14 | |||
14 | Lea Radle (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-01-21 | |||
14 | Matea Bosnjak (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-12-21 | |||
14 | Dorentina Mucici (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-09-13 | |||
15 | Emilie Rapp (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-02-08 | |||
15 | Fabienne Fay (until 2016-06-30) | 2000-06-19 | |||
16 | Janina Kern (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-03-09 | |||
16 | Nadine Urban (until 2016-06-30) | 2000-10-28 | |||
17 | Athanasia Moraitou (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-04-02 | |||
17 | Selina Walter (until 2016-06-30) | 2000-01-07 | |||
19 | Stefanie Grimm (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-07-10 | |||
20 | Franziska Herrmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-05-26 | |||
20 | Carina Spengler (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | |||
22 | Aline Bohringer (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-12-20 | |||
22 | Phoebe Vilsmeier (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-07-31 | |||
23 | Lena Sender (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-07-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Julia Rudolph (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-12-18 | ||||
2 | Sandra Borowski (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-03-06 | |||
6 | Joy Strahle (Grube) (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-01-01 | |||
9 | Anna Vidovenyecz (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-12-15 | |||
16 | Nina Muller (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-05-21 | |||
16 | Nina Muller (until 2016-06-30) | ||||
18 | Julia Rudolph (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-12-18 | |||
18 | Sofia Borges (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-06-04 | |||
21 | Ashley Jerise Shim (from 2016-01-28) (until 2016-06-30) |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2015-08-23 14:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-09-27 14:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |