Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Norbert Frey (until 2017-06-30) | 1961-06-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Sara Elsa Auweiler (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-01-30 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tamara Bajic (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-06-22 | ||||
Pavla Benyrova (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-09-29 | ||||
Silke Birkner (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-10-31 | ||||
Paula Bittner (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-08-20 | ||||
Nadine Brunner (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-03-03 | ||||
Marina Buttel (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-02-15 | ||||
Katharina Eisen (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-05-16 | ||||
Anna-Maria Exner (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-03-24 | ||||
Caroline Eberth (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-10-13 | ||||
Sabine Fabritius (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-04-27 | ||||
Kiara Fleischmann (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-07-18 | ||||
Bana Ghebreab (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-07-28 | ||||
Simone Grimm (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-11-08 | ||||
Sandra Haring (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-04-24 | ||||
Jasmin Ittner (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-03-23 | ||||
Nathalie Kinder (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-01-18 | ||||
Lena Lederer (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-01-18 | ||||
Rebecca Leinberger (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-02-06 | ||||
Josephine Luksch (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-06-16 | ||||
Denise Lutz (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-07-25 | ||||
Anna Madl (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-03-15 | ||||
Lea Paulick (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-09-02 | ||||
Michelle Pistoia (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-11-07 | ||||
Nina Raasch (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-01-05 | ||||
Carolin Raumer (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-05-20 | ||||
Luisa Richert (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-09-17 | ||||
Marissa Schultz (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-08-19 | ||||
Katharina Rupp (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-01-25 | ||||
Saskia Seidel (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-10-05 | ||||
Helena Sinke (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-11-30 | ||||
Gina Steiner (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-12-27 | ||||
Lisa Tietz (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-04-21 | ||||
Kim Urbanek (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-04-21 | ||||
Leonie Vogel (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-07-19 | ||||
Anna Wachal (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-08-18 | ||||
Pia Weiss (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-12-24 | ||||
Sina Zimmermann (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-07-18 | ||||
Aycan Yanac (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-11-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Laila Auerochs (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-07-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2016-08-21 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |