Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Denis Kallwitz (until 2017-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Tanja Belting (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-05-29 | ||||
Michelle Brucken (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-02-27 | ||||
Sarah Heynck (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-05-18 | ||||
1 | Helen Ewald (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-09-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Marita Hund (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-05-21 | ||||
Anna Hoyer (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-10-18 | ||||
Andrea Renzel (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-08-19 | ||||
Larissa Schaffeld (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-01-11 | ||||
Jana Schmeinck (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-01-10 | ||||
15 | Wiebke Terwege (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-10-12 | |||
17 | Stefanie Porada (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-03-06 | |||
18 | Maike Goting (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-07-01 | |||
19 | Ines Ridder (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-12-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Rieke Bonhoff (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-12-18 | ||||
Kim Dammeier (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-07-23 | ||||
Elvira Deliya (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-05-09 | ||||
Franca Piegsa (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-02-16 | ||||
Karin Renzel (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-01-21 | ||||
Anna Schmitz (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-07-12 | ||||
Marie Schroer (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-09-14 | ||||
6 | Jolina Opladen (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-08 | |||
8 | Ann-Sophie Vogel (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-09-13 | |||
9 | Alessandra Vogel (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-06-07 | |||
16 | Angelina Greupner (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-12-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Friederike Boggering (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-09-01 | ||||
Marie-Theres Giesing (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-11-27 | ||||
Marina Ricken (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-09-22 | ||||
Charlotte Wupping (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-03-19 | ||||
10 | Helena Sangs (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-06-04 | |||
10 | Alina Stallmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-01-27 | |||
29 | Michelle Buning (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-09-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2016-08-21 11:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |