Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Achim Mohr (until 2018-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Sarah-Lisa Dubel (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-03-26 | ||||
1 | Janina Beffart (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-11-04 | |||
24 | Anja Lepper (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-01-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Ann-Kathrin Kundermann (until 2021-06-30) | |||||
Leonie Weide (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-04-09 | ||||
2 | Jaqueline Klippert (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-08-21 | |||
3 | Maike Simbeck (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-09-08 | |||
4 | Denise Michelle Meinberg (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-11-06 | |||
6 | Lorena Preiss (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-05-17 | |||
9 | Dana Moll (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-04-16 | |||
14 | Jeanine Stofhas (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-08-07 | |||
16 | Alica Kanbach (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-06-23 | |||
23 | Anna-Lena Waskow (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-03-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Julia Christ (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-05-31 | ||||
Leonie Schafer (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-01-27 | ||||
Besarta Hisenay (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-10-21 | ||||
Aylin Oezen (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-02-20 | ||||
Dana Moell (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-04-16 | ||||
4 | Lisann Kaut (from 2017-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-08-24 | |||
5 | Kathrin Schermuly (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-11-15 | |||
7 | Lea Hartmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-08-17 | |||
8 | Johanna Straube (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-06-11 | |||
9 | Selina Heinzeroth (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-09-25 | |||
10 | Julia Schlothauer (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-12-20 | |||
13 | Marie Henrich (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-05-13 | |||
14 | Lisann Kaut (from 2016-11-01) (until 2016-12-31) | 2000-08-24 | |||
17 | Vivien-Denise Reese (from 2017-03-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-03-02 | |||
17 | Natasa Petrov (until 0201-06-30) | 1997-10-28 | |||
18 | Emelie Huhn (from 2017-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-05-02 | |||
18 | Greta Budde (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-06-24 | |||
19 | Stefanie Peil (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-08-25 | |||
21 | Meike Karoline Wassermann (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-02-27 | |||
22 | Leonie Weide (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-04-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Mara Bonnert (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-12-13 | ||||
8 | Fabienne Scheld (from 2017-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-01-22 | |||
11 | Rebecca Konhauser (until 2019-06-30) | ||||
15 | Tania Rocha Ferreira (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-05-05 | |||
23 | Julia Schermuly (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-01-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2016-08-20 17:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |