Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gino Radice (until 2021-06-30) | 1963 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Selina Szell (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-10-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
19 | Verena Fischer (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-11-14 | |||
23 | Corinna Knisel (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-03-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alicia Kirschner (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-06-30 | ||||
Anna Schuler (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-11-25 | ||||
Berenice Becker (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-06-07 | ||||
Jana Braun (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-02-17 | ||||
Anne Fleig (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-08-10 | ||||
Jana-Maria Butsch (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-01-16 | ||||
Aurora Castiglione (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-08-19 | ||||
Elisa Dogor (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-10-05 | ||||
Nina Finkbeiner (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-01-25 | ||||
Jasna Formanski (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-08-28 | ||||
Katarina Grbavac (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-04-30 | ||||
Jana Kaiser (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-04-04 | ||||
Hannah Keller (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-05-14 | ||||
Lena Klaiber (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-08-07 | ||||
Naomi Krinner (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-01-07 | ||||
Lara Nickolaus (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-04-07 | ||||
Carina Reich (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-10-18 | ||||
Kristin Ronecker (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-09-17 | ||||
Sonia Santos Ribeira (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-07-22 | ||||
Lea Scharf (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-11-14 | ||||
Eve Schmidt (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-03-09 | ||||
Theresa Speck (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-04-24 | ||||
Marie Stober (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-12-16 | ||||
Monique Vollmer (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-06-25 | ||||
8 | Nadine Grutzmacher (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-09-08 | |||
10 | Carmen Hirt (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-12-28 | |||
17 | Carina Walde (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-04-28 | |||
20 | Tabea Griss (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-03-27 | |||
22 | Anja Hahn (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-02-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Luisa Radice (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-09-09 | |||
12 | Lena Engesser (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-07-11 | |||
16 | Tina Schweizer (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-05-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2016-08-21 11:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-10-09 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |