Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainerin | |||||
Christina Schellenberg (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-02-20 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Pfeuffer (from 2017-05-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-02-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Anke Gulpers (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-05-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Anna Grimm (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-06-16 | |||
3 | Mara Grimm (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-07-08 | |||
8 | Lena Obermeier (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-07-15 | |||
19 | Katharina Hampicke (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-03-21 | |||
22 | Leonie Haberacker (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-06-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Julia Kohl (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-12-17 | ||||
Linda Rabe (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-31 | ||||
Mona Schomber (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-02-03 | ||||
Lea Gerlinger (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-05-22 | ||||
Susanne Goth (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-05-25 | ||||
Rebecca Haager (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-11-27 | ||||
Natascha May (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-05-31 | ||||
4 | Judith Hubsch (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-07-14 | |||
6 | Christine Mendt (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-02-07 | |||
7 | Meike Kellermann (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-08-22 | |||
9 | Meike Wischgoll (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-06-19 | |||
10 | Julia Bruckner (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-05-18 | |||
11 | Angelika Rossler (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-07-19 | |||
12 | Anna Hofrichter (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-07-20 | |||
16 | Ellen Riess (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-12-08 | |||
17 | Sara Hofmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-11-24 | |||
20 | Christina Schellenberg (from 2017-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-02-20 | |||
21 | Maren Haberacker (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-06-05 | |||
28 | Aida Kardovic (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-01-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
16 | Ellen Riess (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-12-08 | |||
18 | Nina Heisel (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-12-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2016-08-21 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-10-09 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2016-12-03 14:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |