Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Worle (until 2019-06-30) | 1982-02-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Roman Langer (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Fei Wang (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-03-22 | |||
28 | Jacintha Weimar (until 2020-08-31) | 1998-06-11 | |||
31 | Manuela Zinsberger (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-10-19 | |||
32 | Tinja-Riikka Korpela (until 2017-12-17) | 1986-05-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Gina Lewandowski (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-04-13 | |||
4 | Kristin Demann (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-04-07 | |||
5 | Laura Georges (from 2018-01-08) (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-08-20 | |||
5 | Claudia van den Heiligenberg (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-03-25 | |||
19 | Carina Wenninger (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-02-06 | |||
20 | Leonie Maier (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-09-29 | |||
22 | Verena Faißt (until 2020-08-31) | 1989-05-22 | |||
25 | Viktoria Schnaderbeck (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-01-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Anja Pfluger (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-11-16 | ||||
Ricarda Kiessling (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-06-23 | ||||
3 | Leah Galton (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-05-24 | |||
7 | Melanie Behringer (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
8 | Melanie Leupolz (until 2020-08-26) | 1994-04-14 | |||
10 | Jill Roord (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-04-22 | |||
17 | Verena Wieder (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-06-26 | |||
18 | Dominika Skorvankova (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-08-21 | |||
21 | Simone Laudehr (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-07-12 | |||
33 | Sara Dabritz (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-02-15 | |||
36 | Sydney Lohmann (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-06-19 | |||
38 | Kristin Kogel (until 2019-08-31) | 1999-09-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
6 | Lineth Beerensteyn (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-10-11 | |||
9 | Jovana Damnjanovic (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-11-24 | |||
11 | Lucie Vonkova (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-02-28 | |||
11 | Lena Lotzen (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-09-11 | |||
14 | Fridolina Rolfo (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-11-24 | |||
23 | Mandy Islacker (until 2020-08-31) | 1988-08-08 | |||
29 | Nicole Rolser (until 2020-08-31) | 1992-02-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2017-10-07 15:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2017-12-03 13:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-03-13 18:00 |
0 : 15 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2018-04-15 15:10 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-05-19 15:00 |
3 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |