Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Patrik Recknagel (until 2018-06-30) | |||||
Alexander Schick (until 2018-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Vanessa Fischer (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-04-24 | ||||
Besarta Leci (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-10-14 | ||||
1 | Celina-Fiona Pfender (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-01-27 | |||
13 | Besarta Leci (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-10-14 | |||
13 | Louisa Binley (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-05-07 | |||
Torhüterin | |||||
1 | Lea Schmidt (until 2018-06-30) | 2003-02-26 | |||
1 | Mara Ambrosch (until 2018-06-30) | 2003-07-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Lea Kronmuller (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-08-26 | ||||
Jana Siegle (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-02-16 | ||||
Isabel Schlipf (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-05-05 | ||||
2 | Celina Lienemann (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-08-29 | |||
2 | Isabel Hildebrand (until 2018-06-30) | ||||
3 | Bianca Brosamle (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-04-11 | |||
3 | Svenja Gajewski (until 2018-06-30) | 2002-04-09 | |||
4 | Michelle Joy Martins (until 2018-06-30) | 2003-05-15 | |||
5 | Bianca Blochl (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-24 | |||
6 | Eva Bahm (until 2019-06-30) | 2002-06-01 | |||
7 | Jelena Matijevic (until 2018-06-30) | 2002-07-01 | |||
11 | Neele Beck (until 2018-06-30) | 2002-01-28 | |||
16 | Madeleine Steck (until 2018-06-30) | 2002-01-31 | |||
20 | Madeleine Steck (until 2018-06-30) | 2002-01-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Madlen Weinhardt (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-09-26 | ||||
Lena Tarmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-03-12 | ||||
Ereleta Memeti (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-06-30 | ||||
Phoebe Vilsmeier (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-07-31 | ||||
Matea Bosnjak (until 2017-08-14) | 1997-12-21 | ||||
3 | Jana Scharly (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-11-07 | |||
4 | Paula Ruess (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-10-24 | |||
5 | Pia Oker (until 2018-06-30) | 2001-06-05 | |||
6 | Chiara Nubel (until 2018-06-30) | 2002-09-19 | |||
7 | Gina Rilling (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-12-24 | |||
8 | Anne Forster (until 2018-06-30) | 2001-12-16 | |||
8 | Nadine Rolser (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-04-13 | |||
9 | Nina Schumacher (until 2018-06-30) | 2002-03-13 | |||
10 | Anna-Sophie Fliege (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-04-20 | |||
10 | Samira Sahraoui (until 2018-06-30) | 2003-06-11 | |||
11 | Lea Egner (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-04-16 | |||
14 | Meryem Cennet Cal (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-07-12 | |||
15 | Eva-Maria Virsinger (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-01-13 | |||
15 | Selina Burk (until 2018-06-30) | ||||
15 | Nina Wollschlager (until 2018-06-30) | ||||
17 | Selina Walter (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-01-07 | |||
18 | Corinna Machmer (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-05-11 | |||
19 | Luise Fritz (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-02-02 | |||
20 | Carina Spengler (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Camille Pereira (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-12-06 | ||||
6 | Nina Muller (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-05-21 | |||
9 | Jana Spengler (from 2017-11-19) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-01-30 | |||
14 | Sina Egeler (until 2018-06-30) | 2003-08-01 | |||
15 | Blerta Smaili (until 2019-06-15) | 2002-05-08 | |||
17 | Salome Munz (until 2018-06-30) | ||||
17 | Noelle Maier (from 2018-01-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 2003-06-13 | |||
18 | Julia Rudolph (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-12-18 | |||
18 | Lucia Zovak (until 2018-06-30) | 2002-07-25 | |||
20 | Annika Schmidt (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-06-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2017-08-27 14:00 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2017-10-08 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2017-12-03 14:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |